This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 08:56:58 (UTC).

Boynes et al v. Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Boynes filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilma A. Lewis and George W. Cannon, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00253

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edna Santiago

Warrington Chapman

O'Shay Wells

Anna Rexach-Constantine

Carlos Christian

Margaret Thompson

Clifford Boynes

Frederiksted, VI 00840

Guidrycia Wells

Constantine Mervyn

Anne Marie John Baptiste

John Baptiste, Leoba

Christopher Christian

New Carrolton, MD 20784

Verne McSween

Aaron G Maynard

Neal Davis

Defendants

Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC

EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC

Limetree Bay Refining, LLC

BP Products North America

Freepoint Commodities, LLC

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian James Mersman

Attorney at The Lambert Firm, PLC

701 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Hugh P Lambert

Attorney at The Lambert Firm, PLC

701 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

J Christopher C Zainey, Jr

Attorney at The Lambert Firm, PLC

701 Magazine St., 70130

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jennifer Jones

9003 Havensight Mall, Ste 319

St Thomas, VI 00802

Defendant Attorneys

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

Robert J. Kuczynski

Attorney at Law Office Of Beckstedt & Associates

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Adam Nicholas Marinelli

Attorney at Bolt Nagi PC

Merchant Financial Center 4608 Tutu Park Mall Suite 202

St. Thomas, VI 00802-1735

Lori B. Leskin

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Rhonda R. Trotter

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Robert Franciscovich

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Schuyler A Smith

Attorney at Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel LLP

150 Southeast Second Avenue, Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Andres Pino

Attorney at Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Southeast 2Nd Avenue, Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Jennifer Quildon Brooks

Attorney at Hanilton, Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Se Second Ave, Ste. 1200

Miami, FL 33131

J. Daryl Dodson

Attorney at Moore, Dodson and Russell

Suite 310

St Thomas, VI 00802

Arthur Justin Herskowitz

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan, LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Francis Healy

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Melvin Brosterman

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#79

#78

#77

#76

#75

#74

#73

#72

#70

3 #7

Exhibit Summons

3 #6

Exhibit Summons

3 #5

Exhibit Summons

3 #4

Exhibit Summons

3 #3

Exhibit Summons

3 #2

Exhibit Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

176 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Franciscovich on behalf of Defendant BP Products North America (Franciscovich, Robert) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Leskin on behalf of Defendant BP Products North America (Leskin, Lori) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda R. Trotter on behalf of Defendant BP Products North America (Trotter, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE of Appearance by Andres Pino on behalf of Defendant BP Products North America (Pino, Andres) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Justin Herskowitz on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Herskowitz, Arthur) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Healy on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Healy, Francis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin Brosterman on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Brosterman, Melvin) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin Brosterman on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Brosterman, Melvin) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Rebekka Claire Veith(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-947420) by Plaintiffs Delia Almestica, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Christopher Christian, Constantine Mervyn, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Anne Marie John Baptiste, John Baptiste, Leoba, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: E. Blair Schilling(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-947417) by Plaintiffs Delia Almestica, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Christopher Christian, Constantine Mervyn, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Anne Marie John Baptiste, John Baptiste, Leoba, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC. (TNS) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. (TNS) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Limetree Bay Refining, LLC. (TNS) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Freepoint Commodities, LLC. (TNS) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC. (TNS) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to BP Products North America. (TNS) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. (TNS) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Filing Summonses by Delia Almestica, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Christopher Christian, Constantine Mervyn, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Anne Marie John Baptiste, John Baptiste, Leoba, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Summons, #6 Exhibit Summons, #7 Exhibit Summons) (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jones on behalf of Plaintiffs Delia Almestica, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Christopher Christian, Constantine Mervyn, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Anne Marie John Baptiste, John Baptiste, Leoba, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-940026.)filed by O'Shay Wells, Constantine Mervyn, John Baptiste, Leoba, Christopher Christian, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Verne McSween, Joan Mathurin, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Margaret Thompson, Edna Santiago, Aaron G Maynard, Rochelle Gomez, Myrna Mathurin, Neal Davis, Delia Almestica, Anne Marie John Baptiste, Guidrycia Wells, Carlos Christian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Limetree Bay Refining, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Daryl Dodson