This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2021 at 08:32:41 (UTC).

Boynes et al v. Limetree Bay Refining, LLC & Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Boynes filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Limetree Bay Refining, LLC Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilma A. Lewis and George W. Cannon, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00252

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edna Santiago

Warrington Chapman

O'Shay Wells

Anna Rexach-Constantine

Carlos Christian

Margaret Thompson

Ann-Marie John-Baptiste

Clifford Boynes

Mervyn Constantine

Guidrycia Wells

Leoba John-Baptiste-Pellse

Chris Christian

Verne McSween

Aaron G Maynard

Defendants

Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC

EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC

arclight capital partners, LLC

John Does 1-100

Limetree Bay Refining, LLC & Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC

BP Products North America

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Jones

9003 Havensight Mall, Ste 319

St Thomas, VI 00802

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Delia Almestica, Mervyn Constantine, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Chris Christian, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Ann-Marie John-Baptiste, Leoba John-Baptiste-Pellse, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER (WAL) dated 06/14/2021. ACCEPTING Plaintiffs' #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; ORDERING that the #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal serves to DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE the instant action; ORDERING that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case CLOSED. (MKG) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Delia Almestica, Mervyn Constantine, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Chris Christian, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Ann-Marie John-Baptiste, Leoba John-Baptiste-Pellse, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jones on behalf of Plaintiffs Delia Almestica, Mervyn Constantine, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Chris Christian, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Ann-Marie John-Baptiste, Leoba John-Baptiste-Pellse, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-939483.)filed by Delia Almestica, Rochelle Gomez, Leoba John-Baptiste-Pellse, Guidrycia Wells, Joan Mathurin, O'Shay Wells, Edna Santiago, Myrna Mathurin, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Warrington Chapman, Chris Christian, Carlos Christian, Mervyn Constantine, Neal Davis, Verne McSween, Clifford Boynes, Ann-Marie John-Baptiste, Margaret Thompson, Aaron G Maynard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Delia Almestica, Mervyn Constantine, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Chris Christian, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Ann-Marie John-Baptiste, Leoba John-Baptiste-Pellse, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Document filed incorrectly no signature for Counsel, Counsel needs to re-file document correctly with electronic signature. (TNS) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER (WAL) dated 06/14/2021. ACCEPTING Plaintiffs' #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; ORDERING that the #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal serves to DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE the instant action; ORDERING that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case CLOSED. (MKG) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Delia Almestica, Mervyn Constantine, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Chris Christian, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Ann-Marie John-Baptiste, Leoba John-Baptiste-Pellse, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jones on behalf of Plaintiffs Delia Almestica, Mervyn Constantine, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Clifford Boynes, Warrington Chapman, Carlos Christian, Chris Christian, Neal Davis, Rochelle Gomez, Ann-Marie John-Baptiste, Leoba John-Baptiste-Pellse, Joan Mathurin, Myrna Mathurin, Aaron G Maynard, Verne McSween, Edna Santiago, Margaret Thompson, Guidrycia Wells, O'Shay Wells (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-939483.)filed by Delia Almestica, Rochelle Gomez, Leoba John-Baptiste-Pellse, Guidrycia Wells, Joan Mathurin, O'Shay Wells, Edna Santiago, Myrna Mathurin, Anna Rexach-Constantine, Warrington Chapman, Chris Christian, Carlos Christian, Mervyn Constantine, Neal Davis, Verne McSween, Clifford Boynes, Ann-Marie John-Baptiste, Margaret Thompson, Aaron G Maynard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant