This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 09:33:26 (UTC).

Boyle v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Boyle filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Parcel Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David J. Hale and Lanny King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00541

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

Referral Judge

Lanny King

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tim Boyle

John Chatburn

Defendant

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis R. Johnson

Attorney at Johnson & Krol, LLC

311 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 1050

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

7 #3

Exhibit 3 - SPD - Pooled Account Retirees (Pre-Ratification)

7 #2

Exhibit 2 - Plan 524 & 525 - 2019 H&W SPD

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement between Teamsters Local 2727 and UP

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 to Plaintiffs' proposed Second Amended Complaint by Tim Boyle, John Chatburn re #6 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement between Teamsters Local 2727 and UPS Co., #2 Exhibit 2 - Plan 524 & 525 - 2019 H&W SPD, #3 Exhibit 3 - SPD - Pooled Account Retirees (Pre-Ratification)) (Johnson, Dennis) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

6 #5

Exhibit 3 to Second Amended Complaint - SPD - Pooled Account Retirees (Pre-Ratif

6 #3

Exhibit 1 to Second Amended Complaint - Collective Bargaining Agreement between

6 #2

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Tim Boyle, John Chatburn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint (without exhibits), #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Dennis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #3 Exhibit 1 to Second Amended Complaint - Collective Bargaining Agreement between Teamsters Local 2727 and UPS Co., #4 Exhibit 2 to Second Amended Complaint - Plan 524 & 525 - 2019 H&W SPD, #5 Exhibit 3 to Second Amended Complaint - SPD - Pooled Account Retirees (Pre-Ratification) (KD). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Plan 524/Plan 525 Plan Document

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by Tim Boyle, John Chatburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan 524/Plan 525 Plan Document) (Johnson, Dennis) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to United Parcel Service, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 1- Plan Document

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3152620., filed by Tim Boyle. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Plan Document) (DJT) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 to Plaintiffs' proposed Second Amended Complaint by Tim Boyle, John Chatburn re #6 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement between Teamsters Local 2727 and UPS Co., #2 Exhibit 2 - Plan 524 & 525 - 2019 H&W SPD, #3 Exhibit 3 - SPD - Pooled Account Retirees (Pre-Ratification)) (Johnson, Dennis) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Tim Boyle, John Chatburn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint (without exhibits), #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Dennis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #3 Exhibit 1 to Second Amended Complaint - Collective Bargaining Agreement between Teamsters Local 2727 and UPS Co., #4 Exhibit 2 to Second Amended Complaint - Plan 524 & 525 - 2019 H&W SPD, #5 Exhibit 3 to Second Amended Complaint - SPD - Pooled Account Retirees (Pre-Ratification) (KD). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by Tim Boyle, John Chatburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan 524/Plan 525 Plan Document) (Johnson, Dennis) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/4/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to United Parcel Service, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3152620., filed by Tim Boyle. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Plan Document) (DJT) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less