This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 10:33:29 (UTC).

Reginald Boyland v. Tenthousand Projects, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Reginald Boyland filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tenthousand Projects, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Consuelo B. Marshall and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07321

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reginald Boyland an individual doing business as OTS Records doing business as On the Strength Records doing business as Bank Bag Publishing

Defendants

Michael Lamar White

Tenthousand Projects, LLC

1400 Entertainment, Inc.

Trippie Redd

UMG Recordings, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Caroline Records

Caroline Records a division of UMG Recording, Inc., a Delaware corporation doing business as Caroline Records

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Ross Trauben

Attorney at Singh Singh and Trauben LLP

400 South Beverly Drive Suite 240

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Michael Alan Trauben

Attorney at Singh Singh and Trauben LLP

400 South Beverly Drive Suite 240

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas K Richards

Attorney at Singh Singh and Trauben LLP

400 South Beverly Drive Suite 240

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

Peter J. Anderson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit "A"

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit "B"

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants 1400 Entertainment, Inc., Caroline Records, Tenthousand Projects, LLC, Michael Lamar White. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Caroline Records answer now due 11/17/2021; Tenthousand Projects, LLC answer now due 11/19/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants Caroline Records; Tenthousand Projects, LLC.(Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Caroline Records(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Tenthousand Projects, LLC (pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 10/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Caroline Records answer now due 11/17/2021; Tenthousand Projects, LLC answer now due 11/19/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants Caroline Records; Tenthousand Projects, LLC.(Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Caroline Records(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Tenthousand Projects, LLC (pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 10/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants 1400 Entertainment, Inc., Caroline Records, Tenthousand Projects, LLC, Michael Lamar White. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Reginald Boyland. (Trauben, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Reginald Boyland, (Trauben, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Reginald Boyland. (Trauben, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Reginald Boyland. (Trauben, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31972377 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Reginald Boyland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B") (Attorney Justin Ross Trauben added to party Reginald Boyland(pty:pla))(Trauben, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter J Anderson