This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:21:19 (UTC).

Boykin v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Boykin filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Jung and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01925

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trent S Boykin

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Enrique Escarraz, III

Attorney at Law Office of Enrique Escarraz, III

2500 First Ave S, Po Box 847

St Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/25/2020. (MJP) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/20/2020. (SAO) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF of service on 10/08/2020 as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel by Trent S Boykin. (CRH) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF of service on 10/08/2020 as to Attorney General of the United States by Trent S Boykin. (CRH) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Trent S Boykin. United States Attorney's Office served on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (CRH) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to United States Attorney, Attorney General of the United States, and Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (CRH) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Trent S Boykin. Related case(s): No (Escarraz, Enrique) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/25/2020. (MJP) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/20/2020. (SAO) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (CRH) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1925-T-02CPT. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (SJB) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Trent S Boykin. (Escarraz, Enrique) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Trent S Boykin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Appeals Council, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Escarraz, Enrique) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less