This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2022 at 07:53:06 (UTC).

Boyette et al v. Montefiore Medical Center et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Boyette filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Montefiore Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05280

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheila A. Boyette

Tiffany Jiminez

Defendants

Montefiore Medical Center

The Board of Trustees of Montefiore Medical Center

The TDA Plan Committee

John Does 1-30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark K. Gyandoh

Attorney at Capozzi Adler

312 Old Lancaster Road

Merion Station, PA 19066

Gabrielle Kelerchian

Attorney at Capozzi Adler PC

312 Old Lancaster Road

Merion Station, PA 19066

Donald R. Reavey

Attorney at Capozzi & Associates, P.C.

Po Box 5866

Harrisburg, PA 82498

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Gabrielle P. Kelerchian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/7/2022) (ks) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

7 #4

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

7 #3

Affidavit NJ Certificate of Good Standing

7 #2

Affidavit PA Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Gabrielle Kelerchian

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Mark K. Gyandoh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/30/2022) (ate) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

5 #2

Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing

5 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Mark K. Gyandoh

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant, Donald R. Reavey, is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/28/2022) (tg) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

3 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

3 #2

Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing for Donald Reavey

3 #1

Affidavit Notarized Affdavit of Donald Reavey

3 #3

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/14/2022 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Gabrielle P. Kelerchian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/7/2022) (ks) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Gabrielle P. Kelerchian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26374094. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Gabrielle P. Kelerchian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26374094. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheila A. Boyette, Tiffany Jiminez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Gabrielle Kelerchian, #2 Affidavit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kelerchian, Gabrielle) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Mark K. Gyandoh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/30/2022) (ate) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Mark K. Gyandoh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26343729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Mark K. Gyandoh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26343729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheila A. Boyette, Tiffany Jiminez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark K. Gyandoh, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant, Donald R. Reavey, is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/28/2022) (tg) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 MOTION for Donald R. Reavey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26328523. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Donald R. Reavey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26328523. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sheila A. Boyette, Tiffany Jiminez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notarized Affdavit of Donald Reavey, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing for Donald Reavey, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents John Does 1-30 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Sheila A. Boyette, Tiffany Jiminez. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Donald R. Reavey re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading (John Does 1-30) were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Donald R. Reavey. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 150,000,000; County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 150,000; the County code has been modified to New York. (vf) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Donald R. Reavey. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sheila A. Boyette, Tiffany Jiminez. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The TDA Plan Committee, Montefiore Medical Center, The Board of Trustees of Montefiore Medical Center. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26316200)Document filed by Sheila A. Boyette, Tiffany Jiminez..(Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Montefiore Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABRIELLE KELERCHIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark K. Gyandoh