This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2021 at 12:54:20 (UTC).

Boyer v. Price et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Boyer filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Price. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00442

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brad Boyer

Defendants

Jeremy Duskin

Keith T. Price

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel J. Card

Attorney at Daniel Card Law, LLC

512 Nw 12Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth D. Oglesby

Attorney at Angela D. Ailles & Associates

14000 Quail Springs Pkwy, Ste 230

Oklahoma City, OK 73134

Shena E. Burgess

Attorney at Smiling Smiling & Burgess

9175 S Yale Ave, Ste 300

Tulsa, OK 74137

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #1

Consent or Reassignment Form

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Brad Boyer (Card, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 2/12/2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form)(pmb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Keith T. Price (Burgess, Shena) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth D. Oglesby on behalf of Jeremy Duskin (Oglesby, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Jeremy Duskin [NOTE: Attorney Elizabeth D. Oglesby added to party Jeremy Duskin(pty:dft)]. (Oglesby, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Shena E. Burgess on behalf of Keith T. Price (Burgess, Shena) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Keith T. Price - Served on 12/5/2020. by Brad Boyer (With attachments)(Card, Daniel) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jeremy Duskin - Served on 12/5/2020. by Brad Boyer (With attachments)(Card, Daniel) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Keith T. Price (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jeremy Duskin (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/2/2020 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1432462 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Brad Boyer (Card, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 12/9/2020)(kdc, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 12/8/2020)(kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jeremy Duskin, Keith T. Price by Brad Boyer (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brad Boyer (kdc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. Card