This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 07:06:12 (UTC).

Boyer v. American General Financial Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Boyer filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against American General Financial Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00068

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Boyer

Bangs, TX 76823

Defendants

Select Portfolio Servicing Inc

American General Financial Services Inc

Lindsey Renee Harris

SPS

Sarah Leikam Individually, and doing business as Evicitions Paralegal - TX & HI doing business as Aldrige Pite LLP

Paul A Hoefker Individually, and doing business as Aldrige Pite

Mark D Cronenwett

Philip W Danaher

Joseph Modric Individually, and doing business as Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann PC

Brandi Davis Individually, and doing business as Select Portfolio Servicing Inc

Gordon Green

Naomi Scott

Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann PC

Springleaf Financial Services Inc

Onemail Financial Services Inc

Stephen Day

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Michael Foster Hord, Jr

Attorney at Hirsch & Westheimer PC

1415 Louisiana, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002-2772

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Proposed Order ORDER

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Onemail Financial Services Inc, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER) (Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

10 #1

Cover Sheet Supplement

#10

(#10) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 Complaint, by Plaintiff Susan Boyer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Boyer, Susan) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten image on 1/13/2022) (dsr). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Susan Boyer re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Boyer, Susan) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

8 #1

Additional Page(s)

#8

(#8) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #6 Amended Petition, by Plaintiff Susan Boyer. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Boyer, Susan) Modified text and corresponding document on 12/21/2021 (dsr). (Entered: 12/21/2021)

7 #3

Proposed Order Order

7 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

7 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Onemail Financial Services Inc and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Michael Foster Hord, Jr added to party Onemail Financial Services Inc(pty:dft) (Hord, Michael) Modified to add additional filer name and include attorney Hord for Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.on 12/15/2021 (dsr). (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Susan Boyer. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (dsr) (Main Document 6 replaced to include last page that was omitted when document was originally scanned on 12/2/2021) (dsr). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause, by no later than 21 days from the date of this Order, as to why this civil action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/30/2021) (dsr) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dsr) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Onemail Financial Services Inc, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER) (Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 Complaint, by Plaintiff Susan Boyer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Boyer, Susan) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten image on 1/13/2022) (dsr). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Susan Boyer re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Boyer, Susan) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #6 Amended Petition, by Plaintiff Susan Boyer. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Boyer, Susan) Modified text and corresponding document on 12/21/2021 (dsr). (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Onemail Financial Services Inc and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Michael Foster Hord, Jr added to party Onemail Financial Services Inc(pty:dft) (Hord, Michael) Modified to add additional filer name and include attorney Hord for Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.on 12/15/2021 (dsr). (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Susan Boyer. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (dsr) (Main Document 6 replaced to include last page that was omitted when document was originally scanned on 12/2/2021) (dsr). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause, by no later than 21 days from the date of this Order, as to why this civil action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 11/30/2021) (dsr) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dsr) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against American General Financial Services Inc, Mark D Cronenwett, Philip W Danaher, Brandi Davis, Stephen Day, Gordon Green, Lindsey Renee Harris, Paul A Hoefker, Sarah Leikam, Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann PC, Joseph Modric, Onemail Financial Services Inc, Naomi Scott filed by Susan Boyer. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. ***FILED USING THE COURT'S EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL ADDRESS.*** (rekc) Modified on 11/19/2021 (rekc). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (rekc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPS is a litigant

Latest cases where Mackie Wolfe Zientz & Mann, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC SBM is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant