This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2020 at 09:04:35 (UTC).

Boyd v. VSH Realty, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Boyd filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VSH Realty, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christian F. Hummel and Thomas J. McAvoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. McAvoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bethany A. Boyd

Defendant

VSH Realty, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carolyn B. George

Attorney at Cooper, Erving & Savage, LLP - Albany Office

39 North Pearl Street, 4Th Floor

Albany, NY 12207

Defendant Attorney

Allison Cory Leibowitz

Attorney at Simmons Jannace DeLuca, LLP

43 Corporate Drive

Hauppauge, NY 11788

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 3 days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 12/30/2020. Motions to be filed by 1/29/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/14/2020. Status Report due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/10/2020. (tab) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 5/8/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/10/2020. (tab) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER TO STRIKE re #12 Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (filed as CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN) filed by Bethany A. Boyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/8/2020. (dpk) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#12

(#12) ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO JUDGE HUMMEL'S ORDER entered 4/8/2020** CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bethany A. Boyd. (George, Carolyn) Modified on 4/8/2020 (dpk). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#11

(#11) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#9

(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VSH Realty, Inc. re #7 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#7

(#7) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VSH Realty, Inc. re #5 Answer to Complaint (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by VSH Realty, Inc..(Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VSH Realty, Inc. re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS/COMPLAINT filed by VSH Realty, Inc. (dpk) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B (Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel)

1 #1

Exhibit A (State Court Summons and Complaint)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Rensselaer, case number 2019-264904 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5051654) filed by VSH Realty, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 3 days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 12/30/2020. Motions to be filed by 1/29/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/14/2020. Status Report due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/10/2020. (tab) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 5/8/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/10/2020. (tab) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/9/2020 by telephone. Appearances by Carolyn George, Esq. for plaintiff; Allison Leibowitz, Esq. for Defendant. Pretrial deadlines are established and a scheduling Order will be issued. Plaintiff indicates that she may need to amend the complaint. The Court advises that if defendants cannot stipulate to a proposed amended complaint, parties should notify the Court and a pre-motion conference can be scheduled. (tab) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER TO STRIKE re #12 Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (filed as CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN) filed by Bethany A. Boyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/8/2020. (dpk) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO JUDGE HUMMEL'S ORDER entered 4/8/2020** CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bethany A. Boyd. (George, Carolyn) Modified on 4/8/2020 (dpk). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Jury Demand served on Cooper, Erving & Savage, LLP on April 1, 2020, filed by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VSH Realty, Inc. re #7 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VSH Realty, Inc. re #5 Answer to Complaint (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by VSH Realty, Inc..(Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VSH Realty, Inc. re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, (Leibowitz, Allison) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for VSH Realty, Inc. answer due 3/12/2020. (dpk) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS/COMPLAINT filed by VSH Realty, Inc. (dpk) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Rensselaer, case number 2019-264904 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5051654) filed by VSH Realty, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less