This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2022 at 08:45:07 (UTC).

Boyd v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Boyd filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Leslie Hoffman Price. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01035

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

Referral Judge

Leslie Hoffman Price

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eton Boyd

Defendants

Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Stoller

Attorney at Law Offices of David Stoller, PA

4445 S Conway Rd

Orlando, FL 32812-0073

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/24/2022. (YG) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS returned executed by Eton Boyd. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of service)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Eton Boyd. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 6/21/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Eton Boyd. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Acting Director Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Remark: Doc. #5 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/1/2022. (EP) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Eton Boyd. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Eton Boyd. (Stoller, David) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/24/2022. (YG) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (BD) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-1035-RBD-LHP. (SJB) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19668071) filed by Eton Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit N-400 Receipt, #5 Exhibit Web Portal information, #6 Exhibit Interview Notice, #7 Exhibit Cancellation Notice, #8 Exhibit Processing times, #9 Exhibit Historical Processing Report, #10 Exhibit How to Read Processing Report)(Stoller, David) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Stoller