This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 07:42:54 (UTC).

Boyd v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Boyd filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbra Boyd

Defendants

Akita Kyle

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Allison White Baker Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Brandon McWherter

Attorney at Gilbert McWherter Scott & Bobbitt PLC (Franklin TN Office)

341 Cool Springs Boulevard, Suite 230

Franklin, TN 37067

Jonathan L. Bobbitt

Attorney at Gilbert McWherter Scott & Bobbitt PLC (Franklin TN Office)

341 Cool Springs Boulevard, Suite 230

Franklin, TN 37067

Defendant Attorney

Russell E. Reviere

Attorney at Rainey, Kizer, Reviere & Bell, PLC (Jackson Office)

209 E Main Street, P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Barbra Boyd. (Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

10 #2

Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept

10 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service

#10

(#10) SUMMONS returned executed by Barbra Boyd. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company served on 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell E. Reviere on behalf of Allison White Baker Agency, Akita Kyle, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service

#8

(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Barbra Boyd. Akita Kyle served on 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

7 #2

Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Barbra Boyd. Allison White Baker Agency served on 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/24/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to Allison White Baker Agency, Akita Kyle, and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A - Policy

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Barbra Boyd. (Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS returned executed by Barbra Boyd. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company served on 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Russell E. Reviere. (jm) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell E. Reviere on behalf of Allison White Baker Agency, Akita Kyle, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Barbra Boyd. Akita Kyle served on 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Barbra Boyd. Allison White Baker Agency served on 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/24/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons issued as to Allison White Baker Agency, Akita Kyle, and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan L. Bobbitt and J. Brandon McWherter. (jm) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Allison White Baker Agency, Akita Kyle, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2828914), filed by Barbra Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy)(jm) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.