This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2023 at 07:03:45 (UTC).

Boyd v. DeKalb County et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 Boyd filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DeKalb County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00810

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thasha A. Boyd

Defendants

DeKalb County

Latisha Dear Jackson

Debra DeBerry

April M. Jackson

Toriuna C. Moore

Fayron B. Woodley

Disabled American Veterans

Matthew Jahn

Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP

James T. Brieske

Daveed R. Lift

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Nikisha L. McDonald

Tristen N. Waite

Steven Lynn Walters, II

Elizabeth Marie O'Roark

Joseph Menello

Daniel Millman

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by James T. Brieske, Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP, Daveed R. Lift. (Millman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#35

(#35) REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Debra DeBerry, DeKalb County, April M. Jackson, Toriuna C. Moore, Fayron B. Woodley. (Waite, Tristen) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#34

(#34) REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Lieu of Answer (In Opposition) filed by Latisha Dear Jackson. (O'Roark, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

23 #1

Exhibit Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment

23 #23

Main Document

#22

(#31) ORDER granting #30 Motion to Stay all Discovery; granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Disclosure and Joint Preliminary Report until 21 days after the Court resolves Defendants #20 , #21 , #22 , #23 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/14/2023. (dob) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

21 #1

Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#31) ORDER granting #30 Motion to Stay all Discovery; granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Disclosure and Joint Preliminary Report until 21 days after the Court resolves Defendants #20 , #21 , #22 , #23 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/14/2023. (dob) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed by Thasha A. Boyd. Debra DeBerry served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (dob) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Thasha A. Boyd. Daveed R. Lift served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (dob) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Thasha A. Boyd. April M. Jackson served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (dob) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nikisha L. McDonald on behalf of DeKalb County (McDonald, Nikisha) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Tristen N. Waite on behalf of DeKalb County (Waite, Tristen) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#3

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Thasha A. Boyd re #3 Order. (dob) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to James T. Brieske, Debra DeBerry, DeKalb County, Disabled American Veterans, Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP, April M. Jackson, Latisha Dear Jackson, Matthew Jahn, Daveed R. Lift, Toriuna C. Moore, Fayron B. Woodley. (jra) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #20 MOTION to Dismiss, #21 MOTION to Dismiss , #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Lieu of Answer, and #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by James T. Brieske, Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP, Daveed R. Lift. (Millman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Debra DeBerry, DeKalb County, April M. Jackson, Toriuna C. Moore, Fayron B. Woodley. (Waite, Tristen) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint In Lieu of Answer (In Opposition) filed by Latisha Dear Jackson. (O'Roark, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Walters II on behalf of Latisha Dear Jackson (O'Roark, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/20/2023 to edit applicable attorney (dob). (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Disabled American Veterans, Matthew Jahn. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Thasha A. Boyd re #31 Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (dob) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #30 Motion to Stay all Discovery; granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Disclosure and Joint Preliminary Report until 21 days after the Court resolves Defendants #20 , #21 , #22 , #23 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/14/2023. (dob) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #30 Motion to Stay Discovery MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Pleading filed as single part motion; should be multi part motion. Clerk made necessary changes. (dob) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Motion to Stay Discovery and MOTION to Extend Deadlines by James T. Brieske, Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP, Daveed R. Lift. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emails Confirming Consent to Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Millman, Daniel) . Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 4/14/2023 (dob). Modified on 4/14/2023 (dob). (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service Executed by Thasha A. Boyd. DeKalb County served on 3/6/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. (dob) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed by Thasha A. Boyd. Debra DeBerry served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (dob) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Thasha A. Boyd. Daveed R. Lift served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (dob) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Thasha A. Boyd. April M. Jackson served on 3/7/2023, answer due 3/28/2023. (dob) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nikisha L. McDonald on behalf of DeKalb County (McDonald, Nikisha) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Tristen N. Waite on behalf of DeKalb County (Waite, Tristen) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Thasha A. Boyd re #3 Order. (dob) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/27/2023. (dob) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to James T. Brieske, Debra DeBerry, DeKalb County, Disabled American Veterans, Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP, April M. Jackson, Latisha Dear Jackson, Matthew Jahn, Daveed R. Lift, Toriuna C. Moore, Fayron B. Woodley. (jra) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Thasha A. Boyd. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100001824) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less