This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:19:17 (UTC).

BOYD v. BRENWER et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 BOYD filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against BRENWER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC T TREADWELL and THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00287

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC T TREADWELL

Referral Judge

THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER BOYD

Trion, GA 30753-0668

Defendants

LIEUTENANT BOO

WARDEN BRENWER

CAPTAIN STANFORD

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File to File Objections, re: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Filed by CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(tam) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint ; ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 8/14/2020. (TQL) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (tam) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(tam) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File to File Objections, re: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Filed by CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(tam) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint ; ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 8/14/2020. (TQL) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (tam) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(tam) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CHRISTOPHER BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less