Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:52:58 (UTC).

Boyd v. Bellin, et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Boyd filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bellin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01464

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ivan Boyd

Redgranite, WI 54970-0925

Defendants

C.O. Michalski

Austin J Korman

Long

Kira Labby

Cindy Barter

RN Debra J Bellin

Janelle R Garcia

Shari Klenke

Tom Larson

Ms. "K"

Hildebrand

CO Michalski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions

 

Court Documents

#30

RESTRICTED

#29

(#29) LETTER from the clerk to Ivan Boyd regarding prisoner trust account statement. (cav)

#28

(#28) LETTER from Ivan Boyd regarding prisoner trust account statement. Prisoner trust account statement not enclosed.(cav)

#27

(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ivan Boyd. (lh)

#26

(#26) PLRA FEE NOTICE AND ORDER of USCA re #21 Notice of Appeal Prisoner filed by Ivan Boyd. (lh)

#25

(#25) USCA Case Number 20-3087 USCA re: #21 Notice of Appeal Prisoner filed by Ivan Boyd. (lh)

#24

(#24) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #21 Notice of Appeal Prisoner (lh)

#23

(#23) Pro Se Cover Letter re: #21 Notice of Appeal Prisoner (lh)

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ivan Boyd from USDC re: #15 Order, #20 Order for Reconsideration, #16 Judgment. (cc: all counsel)Newlin Notice to be sent by 12/24/2020 (lh)

1 #20

Envelope

1 #19

Envelope

1 #18

Cover Letter

1 #17

Exhibit 16 - Inmate Complaint Documents

1 #16

Exhibit 15 - Health Service Request, Inmate Complaint Documents

1 #14

Exhibit 13 - Health Service Request dated 1-3-20

1 #13

Exhibit 12 - Health Service Request dated 12-30-19

1 #1

Amended Defendants Section

#1

(#6) Supplement naming Defendant Ms. K in #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Ivan Boyd (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ivan Boyd. (cmb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) LETTER from the clerk to Ivan Boyd regarding prisoner trust account statement. (cav)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) LETTER from Ivan Boyd regarding prisoner trust account statement. Prisoner trust account statement not enclosed.(cav)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ivan Boyd. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PLRA FEE NOTICE AND ORDER of USCA re #21 Notice of Appeal Prisoner filed by Ivan Boyd. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) USCA Case Number 20-3087 USCA re: #21 Notice of Appeal Prisoner filed by Ivan Boyd. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #21 Notice of Appeal Prisoner (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Pro Se Cover Letter re: #21 Notice of Appeal Prisoner (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ivan Boyd. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ivan Boyd from USDC re: #15 Order, #20 Order for Reconsideration, #16 Judgment. (cc: all counsel)Newlin Notice to be sent by 12/24/2020 (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from clerk's office in response to #8 letter from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter requesting clarification by Plaintiff Ivan Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Warden PLRA Letter. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketPartial Filing fee received : $ 25.53, receipt number 34690036806 (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Supplement naming Defendant Ms. K in #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Ivan Boyd (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 25.53 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 4/27/2020.(aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Ivan Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Certification, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2020: #3 IPP Calculation) (aom). [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Ivan Boyd to submit Trust Fund Account Statement by 4/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/27/2020. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ivan Boyd. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ivan Boyd. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Amended Defendants Section, #2 Exhibit 1 - Health Service Request dated 12-13-19, #3 Exhibit 2 - Health Service Request dated 12-15-19, #4 Exhibit 3 - Memo from Health Service Unit, #5 Exhibit 4 - Health Service Request dated 12-18-19, #6 Exhibit 5 - Public Records Request, #7 Exhibit 6 - Offsite Service Request and other papers, #8 Exhibit 7 - Health Service Request dated 12-22-19, #9 Exhibit 8 - Health Service Request dated 12-22-19, #10 Exhibit 9 - Health Service Request dated 12-26-19, #11 Exhibit 10 - Health Service Request dated 12-28-19, #12 Exhibit 11 - Medical Supply Refill Request, #13 Exhibit 12 - Health Service Request dated 12-30-19, #14 Exhibit 13 - Health Service Request dated 1-3-20, #15 Exhibit 14 - Medication Refill Request, #16 Exhibit 15 - Health Service Request, Inmate Complaint Documents, #17 Exhibit 16 - Inmate Complaint Documents, #18 Cover Letter, #19 Envelope, #20 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hildebrand is a litigant

Latest cases where Long is a litigant