This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2021 at 10:58:49 (UTC).

Boxx Sanitation, LLC v. Express Disposal, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Boxx Sanitation, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Express Disposal, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00152

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boxx Sanitation, LLC

Defendant

Express Disposal, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony Jerome Bourget

Attorney at Bourget Law

1119 Regis Court, P.O. Box 81

Eau Claire, WI 54702-0081

Glenn Richard White

Attorney at Weld Riley, S.C.

3624 Oakwood Hills Pkwy., P.O. Box 1030

Eau Claire, WI 54702-1030

Defendant Attorneys

John C. Scheller

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

P.O. Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701-1806

Nancy Cruz

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

P.O. Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER remanding case to state court for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/10/2021. (voc) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#6

(#6) Brief in Support of #5 Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Boxx Sanitation, LLC (White, Glenn) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO REMAND by Plaintiff Boxx Sanitation, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 3/31/2021. Brief in Reply due 4/12/2021. (White, Glenn) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Glenn Richard White for Plaintiff Boxx Sanitation, LLC. (White, Glenn) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice by Defendant Express Disposal, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Express Disposal, Inc.. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chippewa County Circuit Court, case number 2021-CV-54. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2839404), filed by Express Disposal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record) (Scheller, John) Modified on 3/10/2021: Updated stats. (lak) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRecord sent to Chippewa County Circuit Court. (voc/aw) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER remanding case to state court for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/10/2021. (voc) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Brief in Support of #5 Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Boxx Sanitation, LLC (White, Glenn) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO REMAND by Plaintiff Boxx Sanitation, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 3/31/2021. Brief in Reply due 4/12/2021. (White, Glenn) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Glenn Richard White for Plaintiff Boxx Sanitation, LLC. (White, Glenn) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice by Defendant Express Disposal, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Express Disposal, Inc.. (Scheller, John) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chippewa County Circuit Court, case number 2021-CV-54. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2839404), filed by Express Disposal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record) (Scheller, John) Modified on 3/10/2021: Updated stats. (lak) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C. Scheller