This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2020 at 07:06:15 (UTC).

Boxed Foods Company, LLC et al v. California Capital Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 Boxed Foods Company, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against California Capital Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Hixson and Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04571

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas S. Hixson

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOXED FOODS COMPANY, LLC

GOURMET PROVISIONS, LLC

Defendants

CAPITAL INSURANCE GROUP

CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Michael Birka-White

Attorney at Birka-White Law Offices

178 E. Prospect Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

Daniel C. Levin

Attorney at Levin Fishbein Sedran & Berman

510 Walnut St, Ste 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Jonathan Marcus

Attorney at Berkes Crane Robinson & Seal LLP

515 S Figueroa St #1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Laurie Susan Julien

Attorney at Berkes Crane Robinson Seal LLP

515 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

19 #3

Proposed Order

19 #2

Request for Judicial Notice

19 #1

Declaration Of Peter J. Marcus

#19

#18

#17

#16

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Certificate of Interested Entities by California Capital Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CIG Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for California Capital Insurance Company. (Marcus, Peter) (Filed on 9/1/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents .This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #20 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by California Capital Insurance Company. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #21 *** Certificate of Interested Entities by California Capital Insurance Company re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Marcus, Peter) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/14/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Peter J. Marcus, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Marcus, Peter) (Filed on 8/31/2020) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie Susan Julien (Julien, Laurie) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (CIVIL L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by California Capital Insurance Company. (Marcus, Peter) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Jonathan Marcus (Marcus, Peter) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Daniel C. Levin. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. R e: #13 Certificate of Service filed by Boxed Foods Company, LLC (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. E-filer did not enter Capital Insurance Group on the docket as named in the Complaint. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. R e: #1 Complaint filed by Boxed Foods Company, LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Boxed Foods Company, LLC.. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded NOT to enter parties' names in capitalized letters. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re : #1 Complaint filed by Boxed Foods Company, LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to California Capital Insurance Company, Capital Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Capital Insurance Group)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/23/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by BOXED FOODS COMPANY, LLC and GOURMET PROVISIONS, LLC (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14673022.). Filed byBOXED FOODS COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMAPY is a litigant