This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2020 at 11:22:33 (UTC).

BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. v. CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joy Flowers Conti and Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00747

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joy Flowers Conti

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC.

Defendants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John P. Goodrich

Attorney at Goodrich & Associates, P.C.

429 Fourth Avenue, 900 Law & Finance Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Scott B. Cooper

Attorney at Schmidt Kramer PC

209 State Street

Harrisburg, PA 17101

James C. Haggerty

Attorney at Haggerty, Goldberg, Schleifer & Kupersmith

1835 Market Street, 27Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

Jesse R. Loffler

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One Oxford Centre, 301 Grant Street, 41St Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. (Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#11

(#11) BRIEF in Support of #10 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Loffler, Jesse) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #8 Motion to Remand, filed by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Loffler, Jesse) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

8 #5

Exhibit E

8 #4

Exhibit D

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit C

1 #7

Exhibit B part 5 of 5

1 #6

Exhibit B part 4 of 5

1 #5

Exhibit B part 3 of 5

1 #4

Exhibit B part 2 of 5

1 #3

Exhibit B part 1 of 5

1 #2

Exhibit A part 2 of 2

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-20-5272 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Dockets, and Filings (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5624318), filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B part 1 of 5, #4 Exhibit B part 2 of 5, #5 Exhibit B part 3 of 5, #6 Exhibit B part 4 of 5, #7 Exhibit B part 5 of 5, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case CLOSED. This case has been voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). See Doc. #13 . Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/29/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. (Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF in Support of #10 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Loffler, Jesse) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #8 Motion to Remand, filed by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Loffler, Jesse) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Motion to Remand. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Motion to Remand. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF in Support re #8 Motion to Remand filed by BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. (with document #8) (jjg) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Response re #8 Motion to Remand. Defendants' response is due by 6/25/20. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), and no briefing schedule will issue. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 6/15/20. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/5/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION to Remand by BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Cooper, Scott) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Loffler, Jesse) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/27/20. (jhi) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketJudge Cathy Bissoon added. (cmc) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketJudge Marilyn J. Horan no longer assigned to case. (cmc) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 the undersigned recuses from this case and the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/27/20. (jms) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Loffler, Jesse) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketJudge Marilyn J. Horan added. (jmm) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketJudge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (jmm) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Chubb Limited as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (ma) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-20-5272 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Dockets, and Filings (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5624318), filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B part 1 of 5, #4 Exhibit B part 2 of 5, #5 Exhibit B part 3 of 5, #6 Exhibit B part 4 of 5, #7 Exhibit B part 5 of 5, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less