This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2021 at 10:23:01 (UTC).

Bowman v. McDonnell Law Firm, P.A. et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Bowman filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against McDonnell Law Firm, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Taylor B. McNeel and Robert P. Myers, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00121

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Taylor B. McNeel

Referral Judge

Robert P. Myers, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Eugene Bowman

Defendants

Metlife Legal Plans, Inc.

McDonnell Law Firm, P.A.

Hyatt Legal Plans, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Taylor Polk

Attorney at HEILMAN LAW GROUP, PA

4266 Interstate 55 North, Suite 106

Jackson, MS 39211

Defendant Attorneys

Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

James D. Holland

Attorney at PAGE, KRUGER & HOLLAND, P.A.

P. O. Box 320999, 10 Canebrake Blvd., Ste. 200 (39232)

Flowood, MS 39232-0999

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, #8 MOTION to Remand , #12 MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion for Continuance by Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. (Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 5/17/2021. (SR) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion for Continuance filed by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

12 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of David Bowman

#12

(#12) MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion for Continuance by David Eugene Bowman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David Bowman)(Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Order re Winkler v. Hancock

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order re Winkler v. Hancock)(Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Andrew Bryan

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Andrew Bryan)(Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#4

(#4) State Court Record by Defendant Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by McDonnell Law Firm, P.A..(Holland, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Consent to Notice of Removal

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 MetLife's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. MetLife has until 6/11/2021 to file its Rebuttal in Support of its Motion to Dismiss #5 ; its Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #8 ; and its Response to Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion for Continuance #12 . NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 5/17/2021. (KAB) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, #8 MOTION to Remand , #12 MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion for Continuance by Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. (Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 5/17/2021. (SR) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion for Continuance filed by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion for Continuance by David Eugene Bowman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David Bowman)(Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until 5/14/2021 to file his Response to Metlife's Motion to Dismiss. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Signed by District Judge Taylor B. McNeel on 4/28/2021. (KAB) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by David Eugene Bowman (Polk, Edward) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order re Winkler v. Hancock)(Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Andrew Bryan)(Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) State Court Record by Defendant Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Mansfield, Kenna) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3. Incorrect event code selected. Counsel should have selected "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)" which can be found under "Other Answers". Counsel does not need to refile. (wld) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by McDonnell Law Firm, P.A..(Holland, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Joinder in Document by McDonnell Law Firm, P.A. to #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. (Holland, James) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metlife Legal Plans, Inc. from Circuit Court of Harrison Co., 2nd Jud. Dist., case number A2402-21-2, jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0538-4526835) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Taylor Polk