This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 at 07:51:55 (UTC).

Bowling v. Clarke et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Bowling filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Clarke. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Glen E. Conrad and Pamela Meade Sargent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00453

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Glen E. Conrad

Referral Judge

Pamela Meade Sargent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mario L. Bowling

Pound, VA 24279

Defendants

Harold Clarke

M.L. Counts

J. Kiser

Ofc. T.S. Bray

Sgt. J. Stanley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ann-Marie Catherine White

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Richmond

202 North Ninth Street

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J. Kiser, J. Stanley, T.S. Bray, Harold Clarke, M.L. Counts. J. Kiser waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; J. Stanley waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; T.S. Bray waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Harold Clarke waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; M.L. Counts waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019.(White, Ann-Marie)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann-Marie Catherine White on behalf of T.S. Bray, Harold Clarke, M.L. Counts, J. Kiser, J. Stanley (White, Ann-Marie)

#19

(#19) Response re #18 Letter. (tvt)

#18

(#18) Letter regarding service of process by Mario L. Bowling (tvt)

#16

(#16) ORDER denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration regarding U.S. Marshals Service performing service upon defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/17/2019. (tvt)

#15

(#15) Clerks Notice of Service (OAG 1983) sent to Harold Clarke, et al on 7/17/2019 by Mario L. Bowling. Pursuant to the agreement of electronic service. Waiver of Service due by 8/16/2019.(tvt)

13 #1

Declaration

#13

(#13) MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario L. Bowling. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(slt)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Response re #6 Letter. (aab) (Main Document 7 replaced with correct document, Regenerated NEF on 6/24/2019 ) (aab).

#6

(#7) Response re #6 Letter. (aab) (Main Document 7 replaced with correct document, Regenerated NEF on 6/24/2019 ) (aab).

#5

(#6) Letter re #5 Order by Mario L. Bowling (aab)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Verified Statement by Plaintiff Mario L. Bowling (aab)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#14) Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants T.S. Bray, Harold Clarke, M.L. Counts, J. Kiser, J. Stanley re #1 Complaint filed by Mario L. Bowling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/17/2019. (tvt)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J. Kiser, J. Stanley, T.S. Bray, Harold Clarke, M.L. Counts. J. Kiser waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; J. Stanley waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; T.S. Bray waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Harold Clarke waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; M.L. Counts waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019.(White, Ann-Marie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann-Marie Catherine White on behalf of T.S. Bray, Harold Clarke, M.L. Counts, J. Kiser, J. Stanley (White, Ann-Marie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Response re #18 Letter. (tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Letter regarding service of process by Mario L. Bowling (tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Affidavit regarding filing fee by Mario Bowling (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Clerk sending docket sheet.)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration regarding U.S. Marshals Service performing service upon defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/17/2019. (tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Clerks Notice of Service (OAG 1983) sent to Harold Clarke, et al on 7/17/2019 by Mario L. Bowling. Pursuant to the agreement of electronic service. Waiver of Service due by 8/16/2019.(tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants T.S. Bray, Harold Clarke, M.L. Counts, J. Kiser, J. Stanley re #1 Complaint filed by Mario L. Bowling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/17/2019. (tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario L. Bowling. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Response re #10 Letter regarding filing fee, #11 Letter requesting local rules. (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (See Order #9 )Entered by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/2/2019. (tvt) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; directing the payment of the $400.00 filing fee Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/2/2019. (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Prisoner Trust Account Report by Mario L. Bowling (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Response re #6 Letter. (aab) (Main Document 7 replaced with correct document, Regenerated NEF on 6/24/2019 ) (aab).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter re #5 Order by Mario L. Bowling (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/18/2019. (slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario L. Bowling. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Mario L. Bowling (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Verified Statement by Plaintiff Mario L. Bowling (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against T.S. Bray, Harold Clarke, M.L. Counts, J. Kiser, J. Stanley, filed by Mario L. Bowling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(aab)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.