This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:30:38 (UTC).

Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg N. Stivers, Justin R. Walker, H. Brent Brennenstuhl, Joseph H. McKinley, Jr and J. Ronnie Greer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

H. Brent Brennenstuhl

Presiding Judges

Greg N. Stivers

Justin R. Walker

Joseph H. McKinley, Jr

J. Ronnie Greer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc.

ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc.

Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation

Defendants

Beverly Sackler

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

John Stewart

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Kathe Sackler

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Henry Schein, Inc.

Abbott Laboratories

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Wal-Mart Inc.

Miami-Luken, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Mark Timney

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard G. Meyer

Attorney at Dressman Benzinger Lavelle PSC

207 Thomas More Parkway

Crestview Hills, KY 41017

Mark D. Guilfoyle

Attorney at Dressman Benzinger Lavelle PSC

207 Thomas More Parkway

Crestview Hills, KY 41017

David L. Black

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP

4725 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Mitchel Terence Denham

Attorney at Dressman Benzinger LaVelle PSC

321 W. Main Street, Suite 2100

Louisville, KY 40202

Kent Wicker

Attorney at Dressman Benzinger LaVelle PSC

321 W. Main Street, Suite 2100

Louisville, KY 40202

Jennifer E. Kelly

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP

4725 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Korey A. Nelson

Attorney at Burns Charest, LLP

365 Canal Street, Suite 1170

New Orleans, LA 70130

Steve Martino

Attorney at Taylor & Thompson, PLLC

P. O. Box 555

Eddyville, KY 42038

Joseph M. Kramer

Attorney at Dressman Benzinger Lavelle PSC

207 Thomas More Parkway

Crestview Hills, KY 41017

Lydia A. Wright

Attorney at Burns Charest, LLP

365 Canal Street, Suite 1170

New Orleans, LA 70130

Warren Burns

Attorney at Burns Charest, LLP - Dallas

900 Jackson St, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

John W. Barrett

Attorney at Barrett Law Group, PA

404 Court Square North

Lexington, MS 39095

Richard Barrett

Attorney at Barrett Law Group, PA

404 Court Square North

Lexington, MS 39095

Evelyn Li

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP

4725 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Sterling Starns

Attorney at Barrett Law Office, P.A.

404 Court Square North, P.O. Box 987

Lexington, MS 39095

Mark H. Dubester

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP

4725 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Jonathan W. Cuneo

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP

4725 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah G. Conway

Attorney at Jones Day - Los Angeles

555 S. Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Andrew L. Sparks

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC - Lexington

300 W. Vine Street, Suite 1700

Lexington, KY 40507

Other Attorneys

Robert Jeffrey Lowe

Attorney at Kightlinger & Gray LLP - New Albany

3620 Blackiston Boulevard, Suite 200

New Albany, IN 47150

34 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#99

#98

#97

#95

#94

#92

#90

#8

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #4

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C-State Court Record

1 #2

Exhibit B-State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-Amended Complaint

#1

163 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRemark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45060. (KJA) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to Ohio Northern. (JM) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Ohio Northern re MDL No.: 2804 (JM) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN HIS CIRCUIT by Chief Circuit Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. on 1/30/2020. CASE REASSIGNED to Judge J. Ronnie Greer for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel; Judges Stivers & Greer; TD; KL (CDF) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/22/2020; This matter is referred to Chief Circuit Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. for reassignment to a District Judge outside the Western District of Kentucky. cc: Counsel; Chief Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. (via e-mail); Deborah Hunt, Clerk (via e-mail); Julie Cobble, Chief Deputy Clerk (via e-mail) (CDF) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#96) TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge David J. Hale on 1/16/2020; IT IS ORDERED that Judge David J. Hale RECUSES from this matter and this action is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for reassignment to another Judge. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, CM-Judge Stivers (NWT) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of the Judge David J. Hale for final disposition. All future pleadings shall be filed under Civil Action Number 1:19CV-00148-DJH. cc: Counsel (CDF) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. transferring case to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for reassignment to another Judge. cc: Counsel; TD (CDF) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docket(#93) TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge Justin R. Walker on 1/10/2020. Judge Justin R. Walker RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. for all further proceedings. Counsel shall change the case number to reflect the initials JHM for all future filings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/11/2019 granting #90 Proposed Agreed Order. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Richie Pharmacal Co. shall have 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to David L. Black re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to David McMullan, Jr. re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Christopher Lovrien re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Klein, Mathew) Modified to add text on 10/24/2019 (CDF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF). (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/23/2019: This action is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel, K. Lovell (EAS) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/21/2019. Pursuant to 28 USC 455, the Court concludes that recusal in this case is required. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. for all further proceedings and disposition, pursuant to General Order 2019-07. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; EAS (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal from Warren Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 19-CI-01146. cc: Counsel; Christopher Lovrien; David McMullan, Jr., David L. Black; Eveyln Li; Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.; Jennifer E. Kelly; John W. Barrett; Jonathan W. Cuneo; Joseph M. Kramer; Korey A. Nelson; Lydia A. Wright; Monica Miller; Richard Barrett; Rick Yelton; Sarah G. Conway; Sterling Starns; Steve Martino; Warren Burns (JWM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (JWM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Warren Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01146. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2964858 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Record, #4 Cover Sheet) (JWM) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miami-Luken, Inc. is a litigant