This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2020 at 08:29:25 (UTC).

BOWLER v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 BOWLER filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and GEORGE Z. SINGAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00132

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

GEORGE Z. SINGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDA J BOWLER

Defendant

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER

Interested Party

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANCIS JACKSON

Attorney at JACKSON & MACNICHOL

238 Western Avenue

South Portland, ME 04106

Defendant Attorney

RONALD W. MAKAWA

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

J.F.K. Federal Building, Room 625

Boston, MA 02203

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER: Answer due by 7/8/2020. (tcs) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by LINDA J BOWLER. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 5/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt - ORCC, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt - AG, #3 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt - USA)(JACKSON, FRANCIS) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD W. MAKAWA on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (MAKAWA, RONALD) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Attorney General summons, #2 U.S. Attorney summons)(bfa) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LINDA J BOWLER (bfa) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by LINDA J BOWLER. (Service of Process Deadline 7/7/2020)(bfa) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less