This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2021 at 08:13:51 (UTC).

Bowes-Northern v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Bowes-Northern filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph S Van Bokkelen and John E Martin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00315

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph S Van Bokkelen

Referral Judge

John E Martin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shedrick Bowes-Northern

Valparaiso, IN 46385

Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

Jamie Dimon

Crystal Richmond

 

Court Documents

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02574. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#9

(#9) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on October 12, 2021. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#8

(#8) CLOSED TRANSFER Northern District of Indiana - Pro se Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern filed a Complaint on October 4, 2021 (Dkt. No. 1). While the caption of Plaintiff's Complaint notes the "United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana," his Complaint explains that he is located in Valparaiso, Indiana, and he is suing based on events that occurred in Michigan City, Indiana, both of which are in the Northern District of Indiana. It appears that one of the named defendants is located in Michigan City, Indiana, in the Northern District of Indiana, and other defendants are located in New York. It is apparent that this action was incorrectly filed in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana and should have been filed in the Northern District of Indiana. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, Hammond Division. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/12/2021. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-02574-TWP-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (LMK) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 10/6/2021. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Have Filings and Everything Sent Via Email filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

1 #4

Proposed Subpoena to JPMorganChase Bank

1 #3

Proposed Summonses and USM-285 forms

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits including JPMorganChase Modern Slavery Group Statement, U.S. Attorney&

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JAMIE DIMON, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., and CRYSTAL RICHMOND, filed by SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits including JPMorganChase Modern Slavery Group Statement, U.S. Attorney's Ofice press release, Watchdogs articles, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summonses and USM-285 forms, #4 Proposed Subpoena to JPMorganChase Bank)(DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02574. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on October 12, 2021. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLOSED TRANSFER Northern District of Indiana - Pro se Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern filed a Complaint on October 4, 2021 (Dkt. No. 1). While the caption of Plaintiff's Complaint notes the "United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana," his Complaint explains that he is located in Valparaiso, Indiana, and he is suing based on events that occurred in Michigan City, Indiana, both of which are in the Northern District of Indiana. It appears that one of the named defendants is located in Michigan City, Indiana, in the Northern District of Indiana, and other defendants are located in New York. It is apparent that this action was incorrectly filed in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana and should have been filed in the Northern District of Indiana. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, Hammond Division. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/12/2021. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-02574-TWP-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (LMK) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 10/6/2021. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Have Filings and Everything Sent Via Email filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JAMIE DIMON, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., and CRYSTAL RICHMOND, filed by SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits including JPMorganChase Modern Slavery Group Statement, U.S. Attorney's Ofice press release, Watchdogs articles, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summonses and USM-285 forms, #4 Proposed Subpoena to JPMorganChase Bank)(DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant