This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2021 at 07:16:33 (UTC).

Bowes-Northern v. Chicago Police Department

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Bowes-Northern filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Chicago Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04379

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shedrick Bowes-Northern

Valparaiso, IN 46383

Defendant

Chicago Police Department

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: The Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #17 filed by Plaintiff, Shedrick Bowes-Northern, on September 7, 2021 is the second petition received by the court. The first Petition #3 was DENIED without prejudice on September 2, 2021, advising Plaintiff that he must file an amended complaint naming the proper parties before this Court can exercise jurisdiction over the claims alleged in the original complaint #1 . Therefore, the Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #14 is DENIED (again), without prejudice. The Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Representation #13 is also DENIED, without prejudice. Unless and until Plaintiff asserts cognizable federal claims, there is no basis for appointing an attorney. Additionally, the Plaintiff's Motion to Present Evidence #9 , filed on August 22, 2021, as a supplement to his complaint, is DENIED, without prejudice. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#14

(#14) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (kl, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#13

(#13) MOTION by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern for attorney representation (kl, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#12

(#12) CIVIL Cover Sheet (kl, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#11

(#11) RECEIVED AMENDED Complaint and no copies by Shedrick Bowes-Northern (kl, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Plaintiff, Shedrick Bowes-Northern, pro se, seeks permission to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") and moves for attorney representation in this suit against the Chicago Police Department ("CPD"). Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #3 is denied without prejudice; but, because plaintiff does not have sufficient assets to pay the filing fee, the IFP application #3 will be granted once the plaintiff files an amended complaint naming the individual defendant police officers involved in the alleged claims of constitutional violation, as well as the City of Chicago, as the municipality where the CPD is located (as required by paragraphs 4 and 5 of the form complaint #1 that plaintiff is using). At this time, however, the IFP Application #3 will be DENIED without prejudice until such time as a viable complaint is filed with the amendments specified by the Court. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/2/2021. Mailed notice. (kl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#7

(#7) DIGITAL EXHIBIT submitted by Shedrick Bowes-Northern For more information, please visit https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/ExhibitDrop. If you wish to download a digital exhibit, please send your request to the Certified Copy Desk (CCD) inbox at CCD_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov. You will be provided with an invoice and charged according to the Fee Schedule. Once your payment has been processed, you will receive a URL via email to download the exhibit. (crl, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION to present evidence by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern (Exhibits) (kl, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#4

(#4) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern (kl, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (kl, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (kl, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Shedrick Bowes-Northern (kl, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: The Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #17 filed by Plaintiff, Shedrick Bowes-Northern, on September 7, 2021 is the second petition received by the court. The first Petition #3 was DENIED without prejudice on September 2, 2021, advising Plaintiff that he must file an amended complaint naming the proper parties before this Court can exercise jurisdiction over the claims alleged in the original complaint #1 . Therefore, the Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #14 is DENIED (again), without prejudice. The Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Representation #13 is also DENIED, without prejudice. Unless and until Plaintiff asserts cognizable federal claims, there is no basis for appointing an attorney. Additionally, the Plaintiff's Motion to Present Evidence #9 , filed on August 22, 2021, as a supplement to his complaint, is DENIED, without prejudice. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (kl, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern for attorney representation (kl, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CIVIL Cover Sheet (kl, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RECEIVED AMENDED Complaint and no copies by Shedrick Bowes-Northern (kl, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Plaintiff, Shedrick Bowes-Northern, pro se, seeks permission to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") and moves for attorney representation in this suit against the Chicago Police Department ("CPD"). Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #3 is denied without prejudice; but, because plaintiff does not have sufficient assets to pay the filing fee, the IFP application #3 will be granted once the plaintiff files an amended complaint naming the individual defendant police officers involved in the alleged claims of constitutional violation, as well as the City of Chicago, as the municipality where the CPD is located (as required by paragraphs 4 and 5 of the form complaint #1 that plaintiff is using). At this time, however, the IFP Application #3 will be DENIED without prejudice until such time as a viable complaint is filed with the amendments specified by the Court. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/2/2021. Mailed notice. (kl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DIGITAL EXHIBIT submitted by Shedrick Bowes-Northern For more information, please visit https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/ExhibitDrop. If you wish to download a digital exhibit, please send your request to the Certified Copy Desk (CCD) inbox at CCD_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov. You will be provided with an invoice and charged according to the Fee Schedule. Once your payment has been processed, you will receive a URL via email to download the exhibit. (crl, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to present evidence by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern (Exhibits) (kl, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern (kl, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (kl, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (kl, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Shedrick Bowes-Northern (kl, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Police Department is a litigant