This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2019 at 07:59:21 (UTC).

Bowers v. Studio 39 Salon LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Bowers filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Studio 39 Salon LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary A. Fenner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00829

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary A. Fenner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Bowers

Defendants

Studio 39 Salon, LLC

Gemy Vinson-Chiarizio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard A. Voytas, Jr.

Attorney at Ross & Voytas LLC

12444 Powerscourt Drive, Suite 370, 63131

St. Louis, MO 63131

Ethan William Gee

Attorney at Ross & Voytas LLC

370, 12444 Powerscourt Drive

St Louis, MO 63131

Nathan Kyle Bruns

Attorney at Ross & Voytas

12444 Powerscourt Dr, Suite 370

St. Louis, MO 63131

Nathan Ross

Attorney at Ross & Voytas, LLC

12444 Powerscourt Drive, Ste 370

St. Louis, MO 63131

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of settlement by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Studio 39 Salon, LLC served on 10/26/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Gemy Vinson-Chiarizio served on 10/26/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

4 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of filing AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Studio 39 Salon, LLC, Gemy Vinson-Chiarizio filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6535924. Service due by 1/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER directing the parties to file their joint stipulation of dismissal or status report re #7 Notice of Settlement filed by Eric Bowers by 2/3/2020. Signed on 12/4/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of settlement by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Studio 39 Salon, LLC served on 10/26/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Gemy Vinson-Chiarizio served on 10/26/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Studio 39 Salon, LLC, Gemy Vinson-Chiarizio. (Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of filing AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Studio 39 Salon, LLC, Gemy Vinson-Chiarizio filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6535924. Service due by 1/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.