This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2019 at 07:44:21 (UTC).

Bowers v. CSG Inc. Law Firm et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2019 Bowers filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CSG Inc Law Firm. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Burgess. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M. Burgess

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerald L. Bowers

Fairbanks, AK 99701

Defendants

Jane Kauvar

CSG Inc. Law Firm

Richard Lottmann

Joe Kuchle

Danielle Gardner

Upper Tanana Development Corporation

Jeff Cheavens

The Alaska Court System

Ben Seekins

Thomas Temple

Zane Wilson

Mary Shogry

 

Court Documents

19 #7

Exhibit G

19 #6

Exhibit F

19 #5

Exhibit E

19 #4

Exhibit D

19 #3

Exhibit C

19 #2

Exhibit B

19 #1

Exhibit A

#19

(#19) MOTION for Clarification of Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration re #17 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER denying #15 Motion for Reconsideration (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

3 #10

Unissued Summons re Defendant J. Cheavens

3 #9

Unissued Summons re Defendant R. Lottmann

3 #8

Unissued Summons re Defendant B. Seekins

3 #7

Unissued Summons re Defendant T. Temple

3 #5

Unissued Summons re Defendant Alaska Court System

3 #4

Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant N. Rallo

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

1 #1

Attachment A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CSG Inc. Law Firm, Jeff Cheavens, Danielle Gardner, Jane Kauvar, Joe Kuchle, Richard Lottmann, Ben Seekins, Mary Shogry, Thomas Temple, The Alaska Court System, Upper Tanana Development Corporation, Zane Wilson (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #097951.), filed by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Clarification of Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration re #17 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE TO THE COURT by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER denying #15 Motion for Reconsideration (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE to the Court by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order For Dismissal re #13 by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JUDGMENT: case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 9/10/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER OF DISMISSAL; case is dismissed with prejudice. All motions are denied as moot #5 , #11 . Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 9/10/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO THE FEDERAL COURT REGARDING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Allow Plantiff Right of Redemption for Property Sold at Foreclosure Auction by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE to the Federal Court Regarding Foreclosure Sale and Notice to Quit by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay Foreclosure Sale of 791 Eton Boulevard filed by CSG Inc. Law Firm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wilson, Zane) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Gerald L. Bowers (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) VOLUME 2 OF 2 by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 E-31, #2 G-33, #3 H-34, #4 I-35, #5 J-36, #6 L-38, #7 M-39, #8 O-41, #9 R-44, #10 S-45, #11 T-46, #12 U-47, #13 V-48, #14 W-49, #15 X-50, #16 Y-51, #17 Z-52, #18 A-53, #19 B-54, #20 C-55, #21 D-56, #22 E-57, #23 F-58, #24 G59, #25 H-60, #26 J-62, #27 K-63)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S)VOLUME 1 OF 2 by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 A-1, #2 B-2, #3 C-3, #4 D-4, #5 E-5, #6 F-6, #7 G-7, #8 H-8, #9 I-9, #10 K-10, #11 L-11, #12 M-12, #13 N-13, #14 O-14, #15 P-15, #16 Q-16, #17 R-17, #18 S-18, #19 T-19, #20 U-20, #21 W-21, #22 X-22, #23 Y-23, #24 Z-26, #25 A-27, #26 B-28, #27 C-29, #28 D-30)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Stay Foreclosure Sale of 791 Eton Boulevard by Gerald L. Bowers.(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Summons Issued as to CSG Inc. Law Firm, Jeff Cheavens, Danielle Gardner, Jane Kauvar, Joe Kuchle, Richard Lottmann, Ben Seekins, Mary Shogry, Thomas Temple, The Alaska Court System, Upper Tanana Development Corporation, and Zane Wilson. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Unissued summons re Defendant CSG, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Z. Wilson, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant D. Gardner, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant J. Kuchle, #4 Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant N. Rallo, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant Alaska Court System, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant J. Kauvar, #7 Unissued Summons re Defendant T. Temple, #8 Unissued Summons re Defendant B. Seekins, #9 Unissued Summons re Defendant R. Lottmann, #10 Unissued Summons re Defendant J. Cheavens, #11 Unissued Summons re Defendant M. Shogry)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CSG Inc. Law Firm, Jeff Cheavens, Danielle Gardner, Jane Kauvar, Joe Kuchle, Richard Lottmann, Ben Seekins, Mary Shogry, Thomas Temple, The Alaska Court System, Upper Tanana Development Corporation, Zane Wilson (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #097951.), filed by Gerald L. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less