This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 13:55:31 (UTC).

Bowers et al v. Denali State Bank et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Bowers filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Denali State Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M. Smith and Sharon L. Gleason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah M. Smith

Presiding Judge

Sharon L. Gleason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yukon Maxi-Storage

Defendants

Dena' Nena' Henash

First National Bank Alaska

Denali Bancorp Inc.

Christopher Zimmerman

Jyotsna Heckman

The Federal District Court for the Distict of Alaska

Jerry Walker

Michael McLauglin

Texas Bank and Trust

Aaron Pletnikoff

Vitali Kuzmich

Monee Stewart

James Dewitt

Doyon Limited LLC

Dineega Corporation

Tanana Chiefs Conference

John Wallace

KeyBank

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Bruce A. Moore

Attorney at Landye Bennett Blumstein LLP

701 West Eighth Avenue, Suite 1100

Anchorage, AK 99501

Michael Stephan McLaughlin

Attorney at Guess & Rudd P.C.

1029 W. 3Rd Avenue, Suite 400

Anchorage, AK 99501

Jo A. Kuchle

Attorney at Cook Schuhmann & Groseclose, Inc.

714 Fourth Avenue, Suite 200

Fairbanks, AK 99701-4470

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#26

#25

#21

#20

19 #1

*Restricted*

#19

4 #35

Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmerman

4 #27

Unissued Summons re Defendant Weaver

4 #24

Unissued Summons re Defendant S. Lundgren

4 #23

Unissued Summons re Defendant Collier Law Office

4 #14

Unissued Summons re Defendant Heckman

4 #13

Unissued Summons re Defendant Guess and Rudd

4 #12

Unissued Summons re Defendant Gardner

#3

#2

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Jo A. Kuchle on behalf of CSG Inc. Law Firm, Jeff Cheavens, Danielle Gardner, Jo Kuchle, Texas Bank and Trust, Upper Valley Tanana Development Corporation, Zane Wilson (Kuchle, Jo) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Jo A. Kuchle on behalf of CSG Inc. Law Firm, Jeff Cheavens, Danielle Gardner, Jo Kuchle, Texas Bank and Trust, Upper Valley Tanana Development Corporation, Zane Wilson (Kuchle, Jo) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of "Denali Defendants" Objection to Plaintiffs' Notice of Failure to Respond to the Complaint and Request that the Clerk Enter Default by Denali Bancorp Inc., Denali State Bank, Jyotsna Heckman, Aaron Hines, Steve Lundgren, Aaron Pletnikoff, Randy Weaver re #20 Notice (Other) (McLaughlin, Michael) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #2 by Gerald L. Bowers re #19 Notice (Other), #20 Notice (Other) (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerald L. Bowers re #19 Notice (Other), #20 Notice (Other) (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Objection to Notice of Failure to Respond by First National Bank Alaska, Betsy Lawer, Bill Renfrew, Jerry Walker re #20 Notice (Other) (Moore, Bruce) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE THAT DEFENDANTS HAVE FAILED TO TIMELY RESPOND TO SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Gerald L. Bowers (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/7/2021 to correct spelling(LMH, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE to the Federal District Court Regarding 2019 Tax Return for Gerald L. Bowers by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Confirmation of Signed Delivery for Summons' sent on Notice No. 2, Docket Item #16 by Gerald L. Bowers re #16 . (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Confirmation of Signed Delivery for Summons' Sent on Notice No.1, Docket Item #15 by Gerald L. Bowers re #15 Notice (Other) (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unissued summons re Defendant J. Burns, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Borgeson)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against John J. Burns, CSG Inc. Law Firm, Jeff Cheavens, Denali Bancorp Inc., Denali State Bank, James Dewitt, Dineega Corporation, Doyon Limited LLC, D. Randall Ensminger, First National Bank Alaska, Danielle Gardner, Guess & Rudd Law Firm, Jyotsna Heckman, Dena' Nena' Henash, Aaron Hines, KeyBank, Michael Killion, Jo Kuchle, Vitali Kuzmich, Law Office of Jeremy Collier, Betsy Lawer, Erik LeRoy, Steve Lundgren, Michael McLauglin, Aaron Pletnikoff, Bill Renfrew, Kathleen Smart, Monee Stewart, Texas Bank and Trust, The Alaska State Court System, The Federal District Court for the Distict of Alaska, Upper Valley Tanana Development Corporation, Jerry Walker, John Wallace, Randy Weaver, Zane Wilson, Yukon Title Company Inc., Christopher Zimmerman, borgeson & Burns PC, filed by Bowers Investment Company LLC., Gerald L. Bowers, Bowers Office Products Inc., Yukon Maxi-Storage, Bowers General Construction.(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO THE FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ALASKA by Gerald L. Bowers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Annotation: Your recent filing with the District of Alaska is in error. Docket 1 Complaint filed by Yukon Maxi-Storage, Gerald L. Bowers, Bowers Investment Company LLC., Bowers Office Products Inc., Bowers General Construction is not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2.In an abundance of caution access to the document has been secured. Plaintiffs should review Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#6) SLG TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to D.Ak.LMR 2, this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Smith for all pretrial disposition or findings and recommendations. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#5) TMB TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 4:21-cv-00007-SLG. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to CSG Inc. Law Firm, Jeff Cheavens, Denali Bancorp Inc., Denali State Bank, James Dewitt, Dineega Corporation, Doyon Limited LLC, D. Randall Ensminger, First National Bank Alaska, Danielle Gardner, Guess & Rudd Law Firm, Jyotsna Heckman, Dena' Nena' Henash, Aaron Hines, KeyBank, Michael Killion, Jo Kuchle, Vitali Kuzmich, Law Office of Jeremy Collier, Betsy Lawer, LeRoy, Erik, Steve Lundgren, Michael McLauglin, Aaron Pletnikoff, Bill Renfrew, Kathleen Smart, Monee Stewart, Texas Bank and Trust, The Alaska State Court System, The Federal District Court for the Distict of Alaska, Upper Valley Tanana Development Corporation, Jerry Walker, John Wallace, Randy Weaver, Zane Wilson, Yukon Title Company Inc., Christopher Zimmerman. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant Alaska Court System, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Renfrew, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Lawer, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant CSG, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Dena, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant Denali Bancorp, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant Denali State Bank, #7 Unissued Summons re Defendant dineega, #8 Unissued Summons re Defendant Doyon, #9 Unissued Summons re Defendant E. Leroy, #10 Unissued Summons re Defendant Ensminger, #11 Unissued Summons re Defendant First National, #12 Unissued Summons re Defendant Gardner, #13 Unissued Summons re Defendant Guess and Rudd, #14 Unissued Summons re Defendant Heckman, #15 Unissued Summons re Defendant Hines, #16 Unissued Summons re Defendant Dewitt, #17 Unissued Summons re Defendant Walker, #18 Unissued Summons re Defendant Cheavens, #19 Unissued Summons re Defendant J. Kuchle, #20 Unissued Summons re Defendant Keybank, #21 Unissued Summons re Defendant Killion, #22 Unissued Summons re Defendant Kuzmich, #23 Unissued Summons re Defendant Collier Law Office, #24 Unissued Summons re Defendant S. Lundgren, #25 Unissued Summons re Defendant M. Mclaughlin, #26 Unissued Summons re Defendant Pletnikoff, #27 Unissued Summons re Defendant Weaver, #28 Unissued Summons re Defendant Smart, #29 Unissued Summons re Defendant Texas Bank, #30 Unissued Summons re Defendant Upper Tanana, #31 Unissued Summons re Defendant US District Court, #32 Unissued Summons re Defendant Wallace, #33 Unissued Summons re Defendant Yukon Title, #34 Unissued Summons re Defendant Wilson, #35 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmerman)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2021: #36 Unissued Summons re Defendant Ak Court System, #37 Unissued Summons re Defendant M. Stewart) (LMH, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Gerald L. Bowers, Bowers General Construction, Bowers Investment Company LLC., Bowers Office Products Inc., Yukon Maxi-Storage (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Doyon Limited LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dena' Nena' Henash d/b/a Tanana Chiefs Conference is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas Bank and Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases where First National Bank of North Arkansas is a litigant