This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2019 at 07:42:37 (UTC).

Bowen v. Bituminous Paving, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Bowen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bituminous Paving, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L. Viken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05054

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey L. Viken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ernest W. Bowen

Defendant

Bituminous Paving, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Verne Goodsell

Attorney at Goodsell Quinn, LLP

246 Founders Park Dr., Suite 201, Po Box 9249

Rapid City, SD 57709-9249

Michael D. Newman

Attorney at Hampton & Newman, L.C.

118 3Rd Street, P.O. Box 1000

Rock Springs, WY 82902

Defendant Attorneys

Katelyn A. Cook

Attorney at Gunderson, Palmer, Nelson & Ashmore, LLP

506 Sixth Street, Po Box 8045

Rapid City, SD 57709-8045

Daniel E. Ashmore

Attorney at Gunderson, Palmer, Nelson & Ashmore, LLP

506 Sixth Street, Po Box 8045

Rapid City, SD 57709-8045

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn A. Cook on behalf of Bituminous Paving, Inc.. (Cook, Katelyn) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/27/19. (SB) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Newman. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/26/19. (SB) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bituminous Paving, Inc.. (Ashmore, Daniel) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Attorney Michael D. Newman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3136923) by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Return of Service of Summons, Complaint served on Bituminous Paving, Inc. on 8/6/19, filed by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#4

(#4) Rejection of Service of Summons, Complaint filed by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Return of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Ex. 1 - Master Complaint served on Bituminous Paving, Inc. on 07/25/2019, filed by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 08/09/2019)

2 #2

AO 85

2 #1

Summons Issued

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Bituminous Paving, Inc. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-311) filed by Ernest W. Bowen in shell case on 07/24/2019. (KLE) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn A. Cook on behalf of Bituminous Paving, Inc.. (Cook, Katelyn) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/27/19. (SB) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Newman. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/26/19. (SB) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bituminous Paving, Inc.. (Ashmore, Daniel) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Attorney Michael D. Newman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3136923) by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service of Summons, Complaint served on Bituminous Paving, Inc. on 8/6/19, filed by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Rejection of Service of Summons, Complaint filed by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Ex. 1 - Master Complaint served on Bituminous Paving, Inc. on 07/25/2019, filed by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Bituminous Paving, Inc. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-311) filed by Ernest W. Bowen in shell case on 07/24/2019. (KLE) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less