This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2021 at 08:52:09 (UTC).

Bowen et al v. 20/20 Eye Care Network, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Bowen filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against 20/20 Eye Care Network, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Smith and Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61292

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Rodney Smith

Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Heather Bowen

Benjamin F. Liang

Defendants

20/20 Eye Care Network, Inc.

iCare Health Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph M. Lyon

Attorney at The Lyon Firm

2754 Erie Avenue

Cincinnati, OH 45208

Alexander Charles Cohen

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

120 E. Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Dorothy P. Antullis

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP

120 East Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Maxwell Harrison Sawyer

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman Dowd

120 E Palmetto Park Rd, Ste 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Terence R. Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock, & DeMarco LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Stuart Andrew Davidson

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

120 East Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 6/28/2021. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case. See attached document for full details. (as03) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Heather Bowen, Benjamin F. Liang. iCare Health Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Heather Bowen, Benjamin F. Liang. 20/20 Eye Care Network, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

6 #1

Certification of Joseph M. Lyon

6 #6

Main Document

#11

(#10) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE Case Nos. 21-cv-61292 and 21-cv-61302 for administrative purposes only. All future filings shall be made under Case No. 21-cv-61275 only. Counsel for the parties in all three consolidated cases shall appear for a telephonic status conference on July 9, 2021 at 2:00 P.M. The parties are instructed to call 1-877-402-9753 by no later than 1:55 P.M. The access code is 9372453 and the password is 0918. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (gp) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Joseph M. Lyon, mailing date June 23, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Terence R. Coates, mailing date June 23, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Heather Bowen, Benjamin F. Liang (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for attorney Joseph M. Lyon. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/8/2021. (as03) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCases associated 0:21-cv-61275-RAR. (gp) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated, Closing Case per ECF No. #10 Order. (gp) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE Case Nos. 21-cv-61292 and 21-cv-61302 for administrative purposes only. All future filings shall be made under Case No. 21-cv-61275 only. Counsel for the parties in all three consolidated cases shall appear for a telephonic status conference on July 9, 2021 at 2:00 P.M. The parties are instructed to call 1-877-402-9753 by no later than 1:55 P.M. The access code is 9372453 and the password is 0918. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (gp) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 6/28/2021. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case. See attached document for full details. (as03) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Heather Bowen, Benjamin F. Liang. iCare Health Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Heather Bowen, Benjamin F. Liang. 20/20 Eye Care Network, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph M. Lyon. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14795841 by Heather Bowen, Benjamin F. Liang. Responses due by 7/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph M. Lyon, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Joseph M. Lyon, mailing date June 23, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Terence R. Coates, mailing date June 23, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Heather Bowen, Benjamin F. Liang (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 20/20 Eye Care Network, Inc., iCare Health Solutions, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14786738, filed by Heather Bowen, Benjamin F. Liang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 Eye Care Network, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Michael Lyon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dorothy P Antullis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terence Richard Coates