This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:07:42 (UTC).

Bowen v University of Texas Medical Branch at Galveston

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Bowen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against University of Texas Medical Branch at Galveston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00382

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel R. Bowen

Defendant

University Of Texas Medical Branch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deshonda Charles Tackett

Attorney at The Tackett Firm PLLC

4412 Stanford St, Ste 1

Houston, TX 77006

Deshonda P. Charles

Attorney at The Tackett Firm PLLC

4412 Stanford St, Ste 1

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

Rola Daaboul

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548 Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Daniel R. Bowen, filed.(Tackett, Deshonda) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Daniel R. Bowen (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23591598) filed by Daniel R. Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Tackett, Deshonda) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to University Of Texas Medical Branch served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020, filed.(Tackett, Deshonda) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by University Of Texas Medical Branch, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2020. (Daaboul, Rola) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay Discovery by University Of Texas Medical Branch, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daaboul, Rola) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to University Of Texas Medical Branch. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(dwilkerson, 3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

1 #4

Summons

#6

(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to University Of Texas Medical Branch, filed.(Tackett, Deshonda) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Stay Discovery by University Of Texas Medical Branch, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daaboul, Rola) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss by University Of Texas Medical Branch, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/30/2020. (Daaboul, Rola) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to University Of Texas Medical Branch served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020, filed.(Tackett, Deshonda) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to University Of Texas Medical Branch. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(dwilkerson, 3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to University Of Texas Medical Branch, filed.(Tackett, Deshonda) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Daniel R. Bowen, filed.(Tackett, Deshonda) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Summons Issued as to University Of Texas Medical Branch. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Daniel R. Bowen (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23591598) filed by Daniel R. Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Tackett, Deshonda) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less