This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2021 at 08:01:32 (UTC).

Boulware-Jones v. Bayer Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Boulware-Jones filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Bayer Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04450

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANITA BOULWARE-JONES

Defendants

Bayer Corporation

Elanco Animal Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Defendant Attorneys

JOSEPH H. BLUM

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

Two Commerce Square

2001 Market Street, SU 3000

Thomas J. Sullivan

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John P Mandler

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S Seventh St

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp

300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Andrew Campbell

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp

300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Blake Anthony Angelino

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

311 S. Wacker Dr., #4300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by John P Mandler, P (Mandler, John) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#17

(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrea Roberts Pierson (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrew Campbell (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#15

(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Blake Anthony Angelino (Angelino, Blake) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#14

13 #1

*Restricted*

#13

#12

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by John P Mandler, P (Mandler, John) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrea Roberts Pierson (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrew Campbell (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Blake Anthony Angelino (Angelino, Blake) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MAILED MDL Transfer in letter to all Counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RECEIVED from New Jersey; Case Number 2:21-cv-11114 (nsf,) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order of MDL Panel (CTO #1) transferring case to the Northern District of Illinois. (MDL 3009 In Re: Seresto Flea and Tick Collar Marketing, Sales, Practices and Products Liability Litigation - Judge John Robert Blakey) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals for all further proceedings. Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/28/21. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER that the #9 Letter Motion to Stay is GRANTED, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/28/2021. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INC.. (SULLIVAN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER CORPORATION identifying Bayer AG as Corporate Parent.. (SULLIVAN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Judge Claire C. Cecchi, Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen no longer assigned to the case. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting Defendants' Letter Request for Case No. 2:21-cv-11114-CCC-JSA to be reassigned to Judge Wigenton as related to Case No. 2:21-cv-7579-SDW-LDW. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/24/21. (jc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INC. (BLUM, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. SULLIVAN on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION, ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INC. (SULLIVAN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER CORPORATION, ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANITA BOULWARE-JONES. BAYER CORPORATION waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INC. waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketJudge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BAYER CORPORATION, ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12456026) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANITA BOULWARE-JONES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS J. SULLIVAN