This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2019 at 07:51:15 (UTC).

Boule v. Saul

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 Boule filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana L. Christensen and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00051

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

Referral Judge

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Michele Boule

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charla K. Tadlock

Attorney at MURPHY LAW FIRM

619 2Nd Avenue South, Po Box 3226

Great Falls, MT 59403-3226

Defendant Attorney

Sarah Moum

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - SEATTLE

701 5Th Ave., Suite 2900, M/S 221A

Seattle, WA 98104-7075

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Moum on behalf of Andrew Saul (Moum, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robin Michele Boule. (Tadlock, Charla) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (HEG) Modified on 8/8/2019 Original summonses mailed to counsel for service (HEG). (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/19/2019) (HEG). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2349247 (HEG) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Robin Michele Boule. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less