This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:55:42 (UTC).

Boudreaux et al v. Air Liquide America Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 Boudreaux filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquide America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby, Jay C. Zainey and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00861

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judges

Karen Wells Roby

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Boudreaux

Dale Boudreaux

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Reilly-Benton, Inc.

Foster Wheeler LLC

Turner Industries Group, LLC

J. Melton Garrett

J E Merit Constructors, Inc

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

CBS Corporation

Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Jacobs Constructors, Inc.

Rubicon LLC

Union Carbide Corporation

Anco Insulations Inc

Travelers Insurance Company

General Electric Company

Chemtura Corporation

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Cross Claimants

J. Melton Garrett

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Foster Wheeler LLC

Turner Industries Group, LLC

J E Merit Constructors, Inc

CBS Corporation

Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Jacobs Constructors, Inc.

Rubicon LLC

Union Carbide Corporation

Anco Insulations Inc

Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.

General Electric Company

Chemtura Corporation

3Rd Party Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rubiante Lolana Brown

Attorney at Cheek Law Firm, LLC

650 Poydras, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Christopher Joseph Fransen

Attorney at The Cheek Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lindsey A. Cheek

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Victor M. Dantin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Kevin Powell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Adam Devlin deMahy

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

6 #17

Exhibit 15

6 #16

Exhibit 14

6 #7

Exhibit 5

6 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Continue to File Opposition to Motion to Remand. The deadline for the Avondale Interests to file their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is extended from 5/5/2020 to 5/8/2020, with any Reply due on 5/12/2020. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/4/2020. (ajn) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Remand Opposition Date by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 05/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE regarding oral argument re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. By Clerk.(jrc) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dale Boudreaux, Eric Boudreaux, Linda Boudreaux, Sam J. Boudreaux, Toby Boudreaux. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on March 17, 2020.(mp) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (Redfearn, Douglas) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2017-5886 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8211308) filed by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:crc), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:3pp).(Melancon, David) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rubicon LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Jacobs Constructors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Turner Industries Group, LLC is a litigant