This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:16:23 (UTC).

Joseph Boudre v. Resonant Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Joseph Boudre filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Resonant Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03403

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Boudre

Defendants

Resonant Inc.

George B. Holmes

Martin S. McDermut

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David E Bower

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Declaration

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Boudre. (Bower, David) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Joseph Boudre, identifying Murata Electronics North America, Inc.. (Bower, David) (Entered: 05/22/2022)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joseph Boudre. upon Resonant Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/19/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Colin B. Davis. (Bower, David) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND SETTING MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE #10 , by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: 1. Within thirty (30) days after the courts entry of an order appointing a lead Plaintiff and approving Lead Plaintiff's selection of lead counsel, Lead Plaintiff shall file (1) an amended class action complaint,which will be deemed the operative complaint in this action, or (2) a notice designating the present Complaint, Dkt. 1, as the Operative Complaint; 2. Defendants shall file an answer or response to the Operative Complaint byno later than forty-five (45) days from the date the Operative Complaint isserved on Defendants; 3. If Defendants file a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 in response to the Operative Complaint, Lead Plaintiff's response to theRule 12 Motion shall be filed by no later than forty-five (45) days from the date the Motion is served on Lead Plaintiff; and 4. Defendants' reply in further support of their Motion shall be filed no later than thirty (30) days from the date Lead Plaintiff's Response is served on Defendants. (lc) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND SETTING MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE #10 , by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: 1. Within thirty (30) days after the courts entry of an order appointing a lead Plaintiff and approving Lead Plaintiff's selection of lead counsel, Lead Plaintiff shall file (1) an amended class action complaint,which will be deemed the operative complaint in this action, or (2) a notice designating the present Complaint, Dkt. 1, as the Operative Complaint; 2. Defendants shall file an answer or response to the Operative Complaint byno later than forty-five (45) days from the date the Operative Complaint isserved on Defendants; 3. If Defendants file a motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 in response to the Operative Complaint, Lead Plaintiff's response to theRule 12 Motion shall be filed by no later than forty-five (45) days from the date the Motion is served on Lead Plaintiff; and 4. Defendants' reply in further support of their Motion shall be filed no later than thirty (30) days from the date Lead Plaintiff's Response is served on Defendants. (lc) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Boudre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bower, David) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joseph Boudre. upon Resonant Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/19/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Colin B. Davis. (Bower, David) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Joseph Boudre, identifying Murata Electronics North America, Inc.. (Bower, David) (Entered: 05/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Boudre. (Bower, David) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33329835 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Boudre. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Attorney David E Bower added to party Joseph Boudre(pty:pla))(Bower, David) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less