This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2022 at 08:22:34 (UTC).

Boucher et al v. Trustees of Canisius College

Case Summary

On May 20, 2022, Sierra Boucher, Lily Engebrecht, Natassia Tuhovak, Hannah Whelan and Cassidy Wood (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Daniela E. Nanau of Law Offices of Daniela Nanau, P.C., filed a civil rights lawsuit against Trustees of Canisius College (“Canisius” or “College” or “Defendant”), seeking declaratory relief with damages, for the alleged sexual harassment and gender-based discriminatory abuse. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Western District of New York with Judge Christina Reiss presiding. 

In the complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged, “This is a professor-on-student sexual harassment case involving a serial sexual predator who was a tenured professor, and Canisius College’s demonstrated deliberate indifference to numerous complaints, raised by or on behalf of many women students and others, regarding the discriminatory mistreatment they were subjected to by the professor, which the College did nothing to remedy, thereby condoning the sexual harassment and other gender-based mistreatment for many years.”

The Plaintiffs further alleged, “Michael Noonan worked at Canisius for forty (40) years and used his position as the Chair of the Animal Behavior, Ecology and Conservation (ABEC) Program within the Biology Department, and as the Director of the Canisius Ambassadors for Conservation (CAC), to condition mentorship and departmental support on a student’s submission to his constant sexually suggestive behavior that regularly crossed the line of acceptable conduct, such as his demands, during school trips abroad, to insert suppositories and enemas into students suffering from constipation, and to be present during emergency examinations of his students by doctors, when his presence was not requested or required.”

The Plaintiffs also alleged, “Since 2014, Canisius’ supervisory faculty, administrators, officers, and employees (such agents, unless referred to by name or position, will hereinafter be referred to as ‘Canisius’ or ‘the College’) have received numerous complaints regarding sexual harassment and gender-based discrimination perpetuated by Noonan, and failed to adjudicate those complaints pursuant to the College’s Sexual Harassment and Gender-Misconduct Policy.”

The Plaintiffs then alleged, “After they complained about Noonan, the College retaliated against them by inter alia undermining their efforts to obtain footage of their travels for Project Tiger; failing to provide an instructor to support the completion of the Project Tiger film in a timely manner after Noonan was removed from campus; failing to provide third and fourth year students with mentors and advisors to replace Noonan, thereby depriving them of recommendation letters and information regarding graduation requirements; and, failing to provide Noonan’s research students with viable ways to continue their research projects after Noonan was removed from campus.”

The Plaintiffs listed six claims for relief. The first three claims are for the alleged violation of Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972, for sexual harassment – hostile educational environment, gender discrimination in terms and conditions of education, and retaliation, respectively. The fourth claim is for alleged breach of contract. The fifth claim is for alleged estoppel and reliance, and the sixth claim is for alleged negligent retention and supervision of Noonan.

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs requested the court for a declaration that Defendants’ conduct complained of herein is in willful violation of Plaintiffs’ rights as secured by the Title IX and New York common law; an award for all damages incurred; the costs of this action together with reasonable attorneys’ fees; pre- and post-judgment interest; and such further relief as the court deems proper and necessary.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00381

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina Reiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sierra Boucher

Lily Engebrecht

Natassia Tuhovak

Hannah Whelan

Cassidy Wood

Defendant

Trustees of Canisius College

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniela Elizabeth Nanau

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Trustees of Canisius College $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4583896, filed by Hannah Whelan, Sierra Boucher, Natassia Tuhovak, Lily Engebrecht, Cassidy Wood.(Nanau, Daniela) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Trustees of Canisius College. (TMK) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hannah Whelan, Sierra Boucher, Natassia Tuhovak, Lily Engebrecht, Cassidy Wood. Trustees of Canisius College waiver sent on 5/23/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (Nanau, Daniela) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

05/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hannah Whelan, Sierra Boucher, Natassia Tuhovak, Lily Engebrecht, Cassidy Wood. Trustees of Canisius College waiver sent on 5/23/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (Nanau, Daniela) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Trustees of Canisius College. (TMK) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Christina Reiss. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Sierra Boucher, Lily Engebrecht, Natassia Tuhovak, Hannah Whelan, Cassidy Wood. to #1 Complaint Civil Coversheet and Proposed Summons filed by Sierra Boucher, Lily Engebrecht, Natassia Tuhovak, Hannah Whelan, Cassidy Wood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Nanau, Daniela) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Trustees of Canisius College $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4583896, filed by Hannah Whelan, Sierra Boucher, Natassia Tuhovak, Lily Engebrecht, Cassidy Wood.(Nanau, Daniela) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less