This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 08:41:56 (UTC).

Bouari v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Bouari filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Daniel J. Albregts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01974

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emile Bouari

Henderson, NV 89074

Defendants

United States of America

Department of Justice

Federal Bureau Of Investigation

Paul Padda

Kimberly Frayn

Troy Eid

Dennis Lao

Charles Ro

Jason Hahn

Michel Ben Amar

Carol Ann Chaney

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRS) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

1 #1

Complaint

#2

(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER - Plaintiff is to file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay the filing fee in full on or before 12/2/2021. The Clerk shall supply proper IFP form and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, IFP packet enclosed. Also Notice and consent to eservice form. - DRS) Modified on 11/2/2021 (DRS). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order, addressed to Emile Bouari. (DRS) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#5

(#5) Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Emile Bouari. (Note to HelpDesk: NEFs should be regenerated as to #3 Order, returned undeliverable. Address of record matches that of submission here. DRS) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Emile Bouari. Address updated to 2334 Thayer Ave, Henderson, NV, 89074. #3 Order re-mailed to Plaintiff. (KF) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#7

(#7) RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402.00, receipt number NVLAS078513. (KF) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#8

(#8) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 paid) by Emile Bouari. Proof of service due by 2/27/2022. (SLD) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed - Troy Eid served on 11/3/2021; Kimberly Frayn served on 11/3/2021; Dennis Lao served on 11/3/2021; Paul Padda served on 11/3/2021; Charles Ro served on 11/3/2021. (DRS) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed - Troy Eid served on 11/3/2021; Kimberly Frayn served on 11/3/2021; Dennis Lao served on 11/3/2021; Paul Padda served on 11/3/2021; Charles Ro served on 11/3/2021. (DRS) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 paid) by Emile Bouari. Proof of service due by 2/27/2022. (SLD) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402.00, receipt number NVLAS078513. (KF) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Emile Bouari. Address updated to 2334 Thayer Ave, Henderson, NV, 89074. #3 Order re-mailed to Plaintiff. (KF) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Emile Bouari. (Note to HelpDesk: NEFs should be regenerated as to #3 Order, returned undeliverable. Address of record matches that of submission here. DRS) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order, addressed to Emile Bouari. (DRS) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER - Plaintiff is to file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay the filing fee in full on or before 12/2/2021. The Clerk shall supply proper IFP form and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, IFP packet enclosed. Also Notice and consent to eservice form. - DRS) Modified on 11/2/2021 (DRS). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRS) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Justice is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Investigation is a litigant