This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:54:44 (UTC).

Bott v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Bott filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alan Bott

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions Inc

Equifax Information Services LLC

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew P Forsberg

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Timothy Clifford Schurmann

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

701 Commerce Street, Suite 602

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Melissa Saldana

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 North Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Anna K Olin

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202

Lishel May Bautista

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2200 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Sarah Holt Sublett

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

6900 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Bautista, Lishel) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#17

(#17) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Trans Union LLC. Amendment to #14 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Settlement Reached with Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Alan Bott (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union LLC. (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit(s) C

1 #6

Exhibit(s) E

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Alan Bott. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10520111) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F) (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit(s) F

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Lishel May Bautista added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:dft) (Bautista, Lishel) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Olin, Anna) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit(s) B

1 #5

Exhibit(s) D

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Trans Union LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Sarah Holt Sublett added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Saldana, Melissa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#11

(#11) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Equifax Information Services LLC Attorney Anna K Olin added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) (Olin, Anna) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Melissa Saldana added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft) (Saldana, Melissa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Settlement Reached with Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Alan Bott (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Trans Union LLC. Amendment to #14 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Saldana, Melissa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Melissa Saldana added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft) (Saldana, Melissa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union LLC. (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Trans Union LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Sarah Holt Sublett added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Olin, Anna) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Equifax Information Services LLC Attorney Anna K Olin added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) (Olin, Anna) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Bautista, Lishel) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Lishel May Bautista added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:dft) (Bautista, Lishel) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Trans Union LLC ; served on 1/10/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC ; served on 1/10/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC; served on 1/10/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) Modified service date on 1/16/2020 (axm). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions Inc; served on 1/13/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) Modified service date on 1/16/2020 (axm). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Trans Union LLC. (hml) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alan Bott. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Alan Bott. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10520111) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F) (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.