2:20-CV-06100
12/16/2020
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Joan M. Azrack
A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Lendora Boswell
Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Jack A. Yankowitz
Ian Kingsley
Certificate of Service
(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
Affidavit of Service
(#10) REQUEST for Production of Documents by Lendora Boswell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Yankowitz, Jack) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
Additional Quality Control Check Sheet
(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Davis, Kimberly) Modified on 12/17/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2020: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/17/2020)
Exhibit C- Statement of Damages
Exhibit B- Email from Counsel
Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint
Civil Cover Sheet
Certificate of Service
(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 606060/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-13844459). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit B- Email from Counsel, #5 Exhibit C- Statement of Damages) (Kingsley, Ian) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/17/2020) (Davis, Kimberly). Modified on 12/17/2020 (Davis, Kimberly). Modified on 12/17/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/16/2020)
Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: DEADLINES AND COURT APPEARANCES. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/24/2021. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Discovery Status Conference held on 2/23/2021. The next Discovery Status Conference will be held on July 13, 2021 at 11 a.m. in Courtroom 840. The Initial Case Management and Scheduling Order is being entered separately. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) NOTICE by Lendora Boswell Rule 26 Disclosure (Yankowitz, Jack) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketSCHEDULING ORDER. Due to a change in the Court's calendar the Discovery Conference on February 19, 2021 is adjourned to February 23, 2021 at 10 a.m. Counsel are reminded to utilize the Court's teleconferencing line at 866-590-5055, access code 9720458, at the time of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/18/2021. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketORDER regarding #10 Request for Production of Documents. Discovery materials are not to be docketed unless they are attached to a motion or otherwise ordered by the Court. In the Court's review of the docket, no answer appears to have been filed although there is a reference to an answer in the removal documents. It appears that an answer was filed in state court but not transferred over when the case was removed. The Court directs that defendant's counsel file the answer on ECF promptly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/16/2021. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict, the Court needs to change the date of the discovery conference currently scheduled for February 18, 2021. The Conference will now go forward on February 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel are requested to mark their calendars accordingly.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/12/2021. (Tomlinson, A.) (Entered: 02/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order re: Joint Discovery Plan by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) REQUEST for Production of Documents by Lendora Boswell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Yankowitz, Jack) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketSCHEDULING ORDER. In light of Judge Azrack's Order dated January 27, 2021, the Court has set this case down for a telephonic Discovery Conference on February 18, 2021 at 10 a.m. Counsel are requested to utilize the Court's teleconferencing line at 866-590-5055, access code 9720458, at the time of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/29/2021. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketSCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/21/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack and will be conducted through the AT&T teleconference center. Counsel shall dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 4785432# at the prompt. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/5/2021. (Posillico, Lauren) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) STATE COURT RECORD Received from Supreme Court of the State of NY, Ctny. of Suffolk, 606060/2020; Received on 12/22/2020. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack A. Yankowitz on behalf of Lendora Boswell (notification declined or already on case) (Yankowitz, Jack) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lendora Boswell (Yankowitz, Jack) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Davis, Kimberly) Modified on 12/17/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2020: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/17/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Eastern District New York Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil Cover Sheet that has been uploaded is a Southern District New York Cover Sheet. Please submit a correct (EDNY) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. indicating Other Affiliate Mardel, Inc. for Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Kingsley, Ian) Modified on 12/17/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/16/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 606060/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-13844459). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit B- Email from Counsel, #5 Exhibit C- Statement of Damages) (Kingsley, Ian) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/17/2020) (Davis, Kimberly). Modified on 12/17/2020 (Davis, Kimberly). Modified on 12/17/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/16/2020)
[-] Read Less