This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:29:15 (UTC).

Bostick v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Bostick filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew F. Leitman and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-11761

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Leitman

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Bostick

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry M. Feldman

Attorney at Barry M. Feldman PLLC

25800 Northwestern Highway, Suite 1000

Southfield, MI 48075

Defendant Attorney

Cary R. Berlin

Attorney at Patrick, Johnson & Mott, P.C.

27777 Franklin Road, Suite 1400

Southfield, MI 48034-8216

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

5 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-173876-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7282657 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

5 #5

Exhibit D

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Dennis Bostick of withdrawal of #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Feldman, Barry) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE Defendant's Original and Amended Affirmative Defenses by Dennis Bostick. (Feldman, Barry) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

5 #3

Exhibit B

#5

(#5) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dennis Bostick. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Feldman, Barry) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#11

(#11) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand (FIRST AMENDED) by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

5 #4

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Barry M. Feldman on behalf of Dennis Bostick. (Feldman, Barry) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit A

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE Defendant's Original and Amended Affirmative Defenses by Dennis Bostick. (Feldman, Barry) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Dennis Bostick of withdrawal of #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Feldman, Barry) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/10/2019. Plaintiff to consider whether to move forward with pending motion for summary judgment. If motion not withdrawn by Plaintiff, Defendant to respond to the summary judgment motion by July 25, 2019. Plaintiff to reply by August 8, 2019. Court will not enter stay of discovery at this time. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (HMon) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS NOTICE TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand (FIRST AMENDED) by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dennis Bostick. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Feldman, Barry) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Barry M. Feldman on behalf of Dennis Bostick. (Feldman, Barry) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Fire & Casualty Company for State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-173876-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7282657 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.