This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2023 at 10:04:03 (UTC).

Bost v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 Bost filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00665

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Bost

Defendant

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathaniel W Bax

Defendant Attorney

James Derrick Quattlebaum

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10950661), filed by Lisa Bost. Service due by 5/18/2023.(kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lisa Bost.(kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Green card and DOI Letter

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#13

(#13) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Joint Stipulation Deadline 7/24/2023. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/24/23. (kmca) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Joint Stipulation Deadline 7/24/2023. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/24/23. (kmca) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Sealed Document - letter from Judge Cain to attorneys. (Attachments: #1 response from Nathaniel Bax, #2 response from Derrick Quattlebaum)(kmca) Filed under seal at direction of chambers (kmca) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Bost. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 2/28/2023, answer due 3/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lisa Bost.(kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10950661), filed by Lisa Bost. Service due by 5/18/2023.(kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less