This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2019 at 07:53:36 (UTC).

Boskie v. Thomas et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 Boskie filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Thomas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. Brann and CK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01369

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

Referral Judge

CK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fasaad Boskie

Huntingdon, PA 16652

Defendants

Nancy Thomas

William Mr. Dreibelbis

Roman Cook

Jinnifer Pierre

 

Court Documents

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/23/2019. (jr) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP) by Fasaad Boskie.(ep) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fasaad Boskie's #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; Boskie's complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice; and Boskie may, within 30 days of the date of this Order, file an amended complaint that addresses the deficiencies identified in the Court'saccompanying Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/3/2019. (jr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/3/2019. (jr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Pltf's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Signed by LP on 08/08/2019. Order sent to plaintiff and Superintendent of SCI-Smithfield.(lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

4 #1

Notice of Consent

#4

(#4) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#3

(#3) U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORMS completed by plaintiff. (lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fasaad Boskie.(lp) Modified on 8/8/2019 (lp). Certification Section not completed. (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Roman Cook, William Mr. Dreibelbis, Jinnifer Pierre, Nancy Thomas lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Fasaad Boskie.(lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Fasaad Boskie. (kpf) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/23/2019. (jr) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP) by Fasaad Boskie.(ep) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fasaad Boskie's #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; Boskie's complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice; and Boskie may, within 30 days of the date of this Order, file an amended complaint that addresses the deficiencies identified in the Court'saccompanying Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/3/2019. (jr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/3/2019. (jr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Fasaad Boskie. (ep) Modified on 8/28/2019 (lp). (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Pltf's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Signed by LP on 08/08/2019. Order sent to plaintiff and Superintendent of SCI-Smithfield.(lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORMS completed by plaintiff. (lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fasaad Boskie.(lp) Modified on 8/8/2019 (lp). Certification Section not completed. (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Roman Cook, William Mr. Dreibelbis, Jinnifer Pierre, Nancy Thomas lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Fasaad Boskie.(lp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less