This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2020 at 08:23:44 (UTC).

Borgese v. Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Borgese filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor Marrero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01180

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor Marrero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jon Borgese

Defendants

THE BETESH GROUP

THE BETESH GROUP HOLDING CORPORATION, INC

BABY BREZZA ENTERPRISES LLC

Betesh Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Warren Belluck

Attorney at Belluck & Fox

546 Fifth Avenue, 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Belluck, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Belluck, Joseph) Modified on 2/13/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against BABY BREZZA ENTERPRISES LLC, THE BETESH GROUP, THE BETESH GROUP HOLDING CORPORATION, INC. Document filed by Jon Borgese..(Belluck, Joseph) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18759382)Document filed by Jon Borgese..(Belluck, Joseph) Modified on 2/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Warren Belluck. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jon Borgese; Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC; Betesh Group; The Betesh Group Holding Corporation, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Warren Belluck. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10000000000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Belluck, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Belluck, Joseph) Modified on 2/13/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against BABY BREZZA ENTERPRISES LLC, THE BETESH GROUP, THE BETESH GROUP HOLDING CORPORATION, INC. Document filed by Jon Borgese..(Belluck, Joseph) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joseph Warren Belluck. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph Warren Belluck to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The PDF must be titled to correspond with the event type used; the All Plaintiff radio button was selected; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 2/18/2020. (jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18759382)Document filed by Jon Borgese..(Belluck, Joseph) Modified on 2/12/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BABY BREZZA ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant