This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2021 at 09:57:20 (UTC).

Arman Boranyan v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Arman Boranyan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07253

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arman Boranyan

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Center BMW

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rene' Korper

Attorney at Law Offices of Rene Korper

27240 Turnberry Lane Suite 200

Valencia, CA 91355

Michael David Peterson

Attorney at Law Offices of Rene Korper

27240 Turnberry Lane, Suite 200

Valencia, CA 91355

Sally A Ayvazian

Attorney at Sage Law Group LLP

450 North Brand Boulevard Suite 600

Glendale, CA 91203

Thomas Solmer

Attorney at Law Offices addre of Rene Korper

27240 Turnberry Lane Suite 200

Valencia, CA 91355

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Daniel R Villegas

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration Andrew K. Stefatos

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING NOTICE - IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The initial status conference scheduled for 11/01/2021 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. A jury trial is set for 3/15/2022 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 3/7/2022 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel form not signed by Sage Law Group LLP.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Sally Ayvazian on behalf of Plaintiff Arman Boranyan. Filed by Plaintiff Arman Boranyan (Attorney Sally A Ayvazian added to party Arman Boranyan(pty:pla))(Ayvazian, Sally) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Arman Boranyan.. (Korper, Rene') (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rene' Korper counsel for Plaintiff Arman Boranyan. Adding Rene Korper as counsel of record for Arman Boranyan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Arman Boranyan. (Korper, Rene') (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Jury Demand #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 9/13/2021. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Status Conference set for 11/1/2021 03:00 PM. See order for complete details. (jre) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. See order for complete details. (jre) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Center BMW without prejudice filed by plaintiff Arman Boranyan. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/9/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Center BMW, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Arman Boranyan. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificat and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV24892 Receipt No: ACACDC-31957549 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew K. Stefatos, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Attorney Andrew K Stefatos added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew K Stefatos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R Villegas