This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2019 at 07:45:55 (UTC).

Boothe v. WM specialty Mortgage Specialty LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Boothe filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WM specialty Mortgage Specialty LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-62685

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Boothe

Coconut Creek, FL 33063

Defendants

Jane Doe

Does 1-100

JP Morgan Chase Bank

Any Public Bonds

JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC.

Citi Residential Lending Inc.

Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP

WM specialty Mortgage Specialty LLC

Broward County Sheriff's Office

Ameriquest Mortgage Company

JOHN DOE

Law Firm Akerman LLP

98 Se Seventh Street, Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131

Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon LLP

One East Broward Boulevard, Suite 1430

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

PennyMac Holdings, LLC

Pennymac Loan Services, LLC

Florida Foreclosure Attorneys, PLLC

PMC REO Trust 2015-1

Law Offices of Daniel C. Consuegra, P.L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ileen Jill Cantor

Attorney at Shapiro, Fishman & Gache, LLP

2424 North Federal Highway, Suite 360

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Eric Marc Levine

Attorney at Akerman LLP

777 South Flagler Drive, Suite 1100W

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#31

30 #6

Exhibit F (Order Granting Writ)

30 #5

Exhibit E (Certificiate of Title)

30 #4

Exhibit D (Order Overruling Objection)

30 #3

Exhibit C (Objection to Sale)

30 #2

Exhibit B (Certificiate of Sale)

30 #1

Exhibit A (State Court Judgment)

#30

#29

#17

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP. Attorney Ileen Jill Cantor added to party Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Cantor, Ileen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #17 Amended Complaint, , MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 1/6/2020) by Akerman LLP, PennyMac Holdings, LLC. Attorney Eric Marc Levine added to party PennyMac Holdings, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Judgment), #2 Exhibit B (Certificiate of Sale), #3 Exhibit C (Objection to Sale), #4 Exhibit D (Order Overruling Objection), #5 Exhibit E (Certificiate of Title), #6 Exhibit F (Order Granting Writ))(Levine, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Law Offices of Daniel C. Consuegra, P.L. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (jao) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted as to Florida Foreclosure Attorneys, PLLC. (jao) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon LLP served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (jao) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Akerman LLP served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (jao) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (jao) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Samuel Boothe. PennyMac Holdings, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (jas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Samuel Boothe. Ameriquest Mortgage Company served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (jas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Samuel Boothe. Citi Residential Lending Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (jas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Compliance re #9 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Copy of Order was mailed via U.S. Mail. By Deputy Clerk (jao) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order Referring Case To Magistrate Judge For All Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS as to #1 Complaint filed by Samuel Boothe. (jao) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Add Defendant Pennymac Holdings, LLC and Equally to Correct and Update the Record of the Defendants List by Samuel Boothe. (Responses due by 11/14/2019) (jao) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Issuance of an EX PARTE Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Imposition of Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure ("FED. R. CIV. P.") ( Responses due by 11/14/2019) by Samuel Boothe. (jao) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Compliance re #4 Order Referring Motion, copy of Order has been mailed out via U.S. Mail. (jao) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Samuel Boothe. (Motions referred to Judge Patrick M. Hunt.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Boothe. (lk) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lk) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Samuel Boothe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lk) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Frenkel Lambert, Weiss, Weisman & Gordon, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where WM SPECIALTY MORTGAGE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Broward County Sheriff's Office is a litigant

Latest cases where CITI RESIDENTIAL LENDING INC. is a litigant