This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2020 at 18:18:04 (UTC).

Boothe Farms Inc et al v. Dow Chemical Co et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Boothe Farms Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Dow Chemical Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00264

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Terry Boothe

Jeffrey D Boothe

Big Risk Farms Inc

Boothe Farms Inc

Adam Boothe

Rinehart Family Farms II

Jason R Hanks

MM Family Farms

Defendants

E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co

Dow Chemical Co

Dow Agrosciences LLC

Corteva Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica W. Hayes

Attorney at Murray Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70130

Arthur M. Murray

Attorney at Murray Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70130

Clayton J. Smaistrla

Attorney at Saucier & Smaistrla PLLC

200 Concord Plaza Drive, Suite 750

San Antonio, TX 78216

James J. Pizzirusso

Attorney at Hausfeld LLP

1700 K Street, N.W., Suite 650

Washington, DC 20006

Stephen B. Murray, Jr.

Attorney at Murray Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70130

Charles A. Banks

Attorney at Banks Law Firm, PLLC

Post Office Box 251310

Little Rock, AR 72225-1310

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Christoph Keller

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

John P. Mandler

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Wells Fargo Center - Suite 2200, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

E. B. Chiles, IV

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

John E. Tull, III

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Shane A. Anderson

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Wells Fargo Center - Suite 2200, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

Ross W. Johnson

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

801 Grand Avenue, Suite 3300

Des Moines, IA 50309-8002

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) NOTICE by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co Firm Name Change and Email Contact Change (Johnson, Ross) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#43

(#43) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #42 Final Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The main document was not submitted during docketing due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The document has been added to #42 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#42

(#42) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Motions due by 7/14/2021. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/31/2020. (slb) (kbc). Docket entry modified on 1/31/2020 to attach main document. (kbc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#40

(#40) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Mandler, John) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

39 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#39

(#39) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Big Risk Farms Inc, Adam Boothe, Jeffrey D Boothe, Terry Boothe, Boothe Farms Inc, Jason R Hanks, MM Family Farms, Rinehart Family Farms II. Joint Rule 26(F) Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Smaistrla, Clayton) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

20 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

20 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#20

(#36) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint motion, No. #30 , granted as modified. Response to motion, No. #20 , due by 10 January 2020. Defendants may reply within 14 days of the response. Answer, or Rule 12(b) motion, responding to any amended complaint also due by 10 January 2020. In the future, any moving party may reply within seven calendar days of a response. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2019. (slb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#8) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #6 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 21 November 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (slb) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

4 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #3 & #4 , denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (slb) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

3 #1

Supplement Certificates of Good Standing

#3

(#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #3 & #4 , denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (slb) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#2

(#2) RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT074119 (bmd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co Firm Name Change and Email Contact Change (Johnson, Ross) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #42 Final Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The main document was not submitted during docketing due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The document has been added to #42 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Motions due by 7/14/2021. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/31/2020. (slb) (kbc). Docket entry modified on 1/31/2020 to attach main document. (kbc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint 26(f) report, No. #39 , noted. The Court approves the agreed discovery parameters, No. #39 at 23, and the proposed briefing schedule. For deadlines, the Court prefers dates certain, but recognizes the complexity of the case. Bi-monthly status reports will be sufficient. A Final Scheduling Order with a new trial date and deadlines will issue. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/31/2020. (slb) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Mandler, John) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Big Risk Farms Inc, Adam Boothe, Jeffrey D Boothe, Terry Boothe, Boothe Farms Inc, Jason R Hanks, MM Family Farms, Rinehart Family Farms II. Joint Rule 26(F) Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Smaistrla, Clayton) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smaistrla, Clayton) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane A. Anderson on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Anderson, Shane) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint motion, No. #30 , granted as modified. Response to motion, No. #20 , due by 10 January 2020. Defendants may reply within 14 days of the response. Answer, or Rule 12(b) motion, responding to any amended complaint also due by 10 January 2020. In the future, any moving party may reply within seven calendar days of a response. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2019. (slb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Ross W. Johnson on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Johnson, Ross) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tull, III on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Tull, John) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Chiles, E.) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #6 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 21 November 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (slb) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #3 & #4 , denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (slb) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephen B. Murray, Jr.. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3563108. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Smaistrla, Clayton) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Arthur M. Murray. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3563068. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing)(Smaistrla, Clayton) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT074119 (bmd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Adam Boothe, Big Risk Farms Inc, Boothe Farms Inc, MM Family Farms, Jeffrey D Boothe, Terry Boothe, Jason R Hanks, Rinehart Family Farms II. (Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Corteva Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E. B. Chiles, IV