This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2021 at 08:59:25 (UTC).

Booth v. GTE Federal Credit Union

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Booth filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against GTE Federal Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn K. Mizelle, Julie S. Sneed and Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01509

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

Presiding Judges

Kathryn K. Mizelle

Kathryn Kimball Mizelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Norman Booth

Defendant

GTE Federal Credit Union doing business as GTE Financial

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Martoccio

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

4890 W. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorney

Angelique Groza Lyons

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks & Smith, LLP

100 N Tampa St - Ste 3350, Po Box 1840

Tampa, FL 33601-1840

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Brenda Norman Booth. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Brenda Norman Booth. Related case(s): Yes (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER of service returned executed on 7/7/2021 by Brenda Norman Booth as to GTE Federal Credit Union. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Standing Order by GTE Federal Credit Union. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. Parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after the defendant appears in this action. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/28/2021. (AS) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against GTE Federal Credit Union d/b/a GTE Financial with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18391079) filed by Brenda Norman Booth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Brenda Norman Booth. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Brenda Norman Booth. Related case(s): Yes (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER of service returned executed on 7/7/2021 by Brenda Norman Booth as to GTE Federal Credit Union. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Standing Order by GTE Federal Credit Union. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. Parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after the defendant appears in this action. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/28/2021. (AS) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-1509-KKM-JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against GTE Federal Credit Union d/b/a GTE Financial with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18391079) filed by Brenda Norman Booth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION DOING BUSINESS AS GTE FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary James Martoccio