Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2021 at 07:57:51 (UTC).

Bonney v. Domino's Pizza LLC

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Bonney filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Domino's Pizza LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01306

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Bonney

Defendant

Domino's Pizza LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Isaac Bautista

Attorney at Seibert Bautista Montoya

2100 Embarcadero, Suite 203

Oakland, CA 94606

Nina Cristina Montoya

Attorney at Seibert Bautista Montoya

2100 Embarcadero, Suite 203

Oakland, CA 94606

Shannon Michele Seibert

Attorney at Seibert Bautista Montoya

2100 Embarcadero, Suite 203

Oakland, CA 94606

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Samuel Bonney.. (Seibert, Shannon) (Filed on 3/9/2021) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Domino's Pizza LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. (Seibert, Shannon) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #3 : Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled to 6/2/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/24/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (no process) (with jury demand) against Domino's Pizza LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-15613750). Filed by Samuel Bonney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Seibert, Shannon) (Filed on 2/23/2021) Modified on 2/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Samuel Bonney.. (Seibert, Shannon) (Filed on 3/9/2021) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Domino's Pizza LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. (Seibert, Shannon) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #3 : Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled to 6/2/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Plaintiff shall serve the Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/24/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/10/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (no process) (with jury demand) against Domino's Pizza LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-15613750). Filed by Samuel Bonney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Seibert, Shannon) (Filed on 2/23/2021) Modified on 2/24/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOMINOS PIZZA LLC is a litigant