This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:08:45 (UTC).

Bonner v. City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Bonner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Dora Lizette Irizarry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07162

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Dora Lizette Irizarry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcus Bonner

Defendants

John and Jane Doe 1-10

Ibrahim Adam

City of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brett H. Klein

Attorney at Brett H. Klein, Esq. PLLC

305 Broadway, Suite 600

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorney

Kiran Hans Rosenkilde

Attorney at NYC Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ibrahim Adam, City of New York, John and Jane Doe 1-10 filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12181126 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Marcus Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Klein, Brett) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Ibrahim Adam, City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Adam summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#9

(#9) ENDORSED LETTER ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 3/31/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/31/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kiran Hans Rosenkilde on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Rosenkilde, Kiran) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Bonner. City of New York served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Klein, Brett) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/1/2020 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/31/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Adam summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Rosenkilde, Kiran) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Bonner. Ibrahim Adam served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. (Klein, Brett) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/1/2020 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/31/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED LETTER ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 3/31/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/31/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Rosenkilde, Kiran) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kiran Hans Rosenkilde on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Rosenkilde, Kiran) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Bonner. Ibrahim Adam served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. (Klein, Brett) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcus Bonner. City of New York served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Klein, Brett) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Ibrahim Adam, City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Adam summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ibrahim Adam, City of New York, John and Jane Doe 1-10 filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12181126 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Marcus Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Klein, Brett) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.