This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 08:46:14 (UTC).

Bonilla v. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Bonilla filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne R. Traum and Craig S. Denney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00251

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne R. Traum

Referral Judge

Craig S. Denney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yolanda Bonilla

Defendant

O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James P. Kemp

Attorney at Kemp & Kemp

7435 W. Azure Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89130

Defendant Attorneys

Scott M. Mahoney

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP

300 S Fourth Street, Suite 1500

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Anthony D. Dick

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

200 Public Square, Suite 4000

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have to and including July 15, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 6/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. for O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC added.. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/29/2022.(Dick, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER approving ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Anthony D. Dick and approving Designation of Local Counsel Scott M. Mahoney. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 7/15/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#11

(#11) EXHIBIT Certificate of Good Standing to #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC.. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anthony D Dick and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott M Mahoney (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6971083) by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#7

(#7) CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#6

(#6) First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yolanda Bonilla re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC served on 6/3/2022. (Kemp, James) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC re ECF No. #3 Notice of Corrected Image/Document re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (CJD) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

3 #3

Summons O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC

3 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Exhibit 1 Appeals Officer Decision and Order

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Yolanda Bonilla. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

1 #2

Summons O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. for O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC added.. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/29/2022.(Dick, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER approving ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Anthony D. Dick and approving Designation of Local Counsel Scott M. Mahoney. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 7/15/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EXHIBIT Certificate of Good Standing to #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC.. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. Attorney Scott Mahoney advised to review and comply with LR IA 11-2(b)(3) and file your certificate of good standing. File the document as a separate entry and link that document to Motion #9 . (no image attached) (WJ) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anthony D Dick and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott M Mahoney (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6971083) by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have to and including July 15, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 6/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yolanda Bonilla re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC served on 6/3/2022. (Kemp, James) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC re ECF No. #3 Notice of Corrected Image/Document re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (CJD) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Yolanda Bonilla. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Appeals Officer Decision and Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC) (Kemp, James) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (WJ) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Yolanda Bonilla. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6924608) by Yolanda Bonilla. Proof of service due by 8/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC) (Kemp, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less