This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 07:04:41 (UTC).

Bonilla v. Clay et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Bonilla filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Clay. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phyllis J. Hamilton and PSLC AGB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-05827

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Phyllis J. Hamilton

Referral Judge

PSLC AGB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Wayne Bonilla

Defendants

Judge Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers

Judge Clarence Don Clay

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE RE MALICIOUS PROSECUTION by Steven Wayne Bonilla (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#3

(#3) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/2020. ***Civil Case Terminated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) Duty Owed to the Plaintiff Pursuant to Case Law against Clarence Don Clay, Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers. Filed bySteven Wayne Bonilla. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE RE MALICIOUS PROSECUTION by Steven Wayne Bonilla (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/2020. ***Civil Case Terminated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Duty Owed to the Plaintiff Pursuant to Case Law against Clarence Don Clay, Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers. Filed bySteven Wayne Bonilla. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less