This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2021 at 10:24:44 (UTC).

Boniella v. Statebridge Company LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Boniella filed an Other lawsuit against Statebridge Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Annemarie Carney Axon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00613

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Annemarie Carney Axon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teresa Boniella

Defendants

Statebridge Company LLC

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M Stan Herring, Jr

Attorney at WATTS & HERRING LLC

301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

John G Watts

Attorney at WATTS AND HERRING LLC

301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

R Frank Springfield

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3100

Birmingham, AL 35203

Matthew T Mitchell

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3100

Birmingham, AL 35203

Holly S Bell

Attorney at Norman, Wood, Kendrick & Turner

1130 22Nd Street S; Suite 3000

Birmingham, AL 35205

Matthew Robinett

Attorney at NORMAN WOOD KENDRICK & TURNER

Ridge Park Place, Suite 3000, 1130 22Nd Street South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Statebridge Consent to Removal

#2

#3

#4

#6

6 #1

Exhibit A

#8

#9

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER governing further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown: Discovery due by 3/1/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 5/9/2022; Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2022. The parties shall be ready for trial in December 2022, to be scheduled by separate order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/15/21. (SAC) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Watson, Kristen) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Statebridge Company LLC. filed by Statebridge Company LLC (Mitchell, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Statebridge Company LLC.(Mitchell, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Statebridge Company, LLC's #9 second motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Statebridge must file its responsive pleading on or before May 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/19/2021. (RLW) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Second by Statebridge Company LLC. (Mitchell, Matthew) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 permits the court, on its own motion, to strike "any redundant, immaterial, impertinent, or scandalous matter." Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f)(1). Paragraphs 107 and 109 are both immaterial and impertinent. They do not offer any support for Ms. Boniella's causes of action. Accordingly, the court STRIKES Paragraphs 107 and 109 from Ms. Boniella's complaint. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/12/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Trans Union, LLC's #6 unopposed motion for extension of the time to file a responsive pleading. Trans Union's responsive pleading is due on or before May 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/6/2021. (RLW) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Defendant Statebridge Company, LLC's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Statebridge's responsive pleading is due on or before May 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/5/2021. (RLW) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Statebridge Company LLC. (Mitchell, Matthew) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/5/21. (SAC) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3830668. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-900957, filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Statebridge Consent to Removal)(KEK). (Robinett, Matthew) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1(a) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC. (KEK) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2021-900957, filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Statebridge Consent to Removal)(KEK) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATEBRIDGE COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holly S. Bell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Robinett